Zhu et al v. Taronis Technologies Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Chad Hatten and Kui Zhu
Defendant: Kevin Pollack, Ermanno P Santilli, William W Staunton, Robert L Dingess, Taronis Technologies Inc, Scott Mahoney and Taronis Technologies Incorporated
Petitioner: Armando Martin Campos and Vardan Petrosyan
Case Number: 2:2019cv04529
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Remark: As to out of state attorney Kenneth Allen Tomchin, removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 5, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Malcolm Todd Brown on behalf of Plaintiff Kui Zhu. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order. Lead Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before August 30, 2019. Defendants shall move to dismiss, answer, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint on or before October 14, 2019. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/2/19. (LAD)
August 2, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/2/2019. IT IS ORDERED granting the Joint Motion for Scheduling Order #31 . Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Matthew Guiney and Kevin Cooper for Plaintiffs. Lisa Bugni and Laura Sixkiller for Defendants. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 9:46 AM to 9:49 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
July 17, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for B Warren Pope on behalf of defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 15, 2019 Filing 31 *MOTION for Scheduling Order Joint by Taronis Technologies Incorporated, Robert L Dingess, Scott Mahoney, Ermanno P Santilli, Kevin Pollack, William W Staunton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sixkiller, Laura) *Modified to add filers on 7/16/2019 (DXD).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 09:45 AM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel to set up a call in number and disseminate to all parties, including the Court, on or before noon on July 31, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/11/19. (GMP)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff Movant Kui Zhu's #15 Motion as Lead Plaintiff and Kevin G. Cooper and Matthew M. Guiney of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP ("Wolf Haldenstein") as Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court terminate the #17 Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Vardan Petrosyan to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Selection of Counsel, as being withdrawn (Doc. 24, Ex. A). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to make the necessary updates on the docket to reflect that Kui Zhu is Lead Plaintiff. All further pleadings shall reflect the new caption for this matter. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/10/19. (GMP)
July 3, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Brian Barnes and Lisa Bugni on behalf of defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE re: JOINT NOTICE REGARDING APPLICABILITY OF MANDATORY INITIAL DISCOVERY PILOT PROJECT by Robert L Dingess, Scott Mahoney, Kevin Pollack, Ermanno P Santilli, William W Staunton, Taronis Technologies Incorporated . (Sixkiller, Laura)
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re: #17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #15 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel and Supporting Memorandum of Law, #16 Defendants' Consolidated Response to Lead Plaintiff Motions filed by Robert L Dingess, Scott Mahoney, Kevin Pollack, Ermanno P Santilli, William W Staunton, Taronis Technologies Incorporated. (Sixkiller, Laura)
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taronis Technologies Incorporated. (Sixkiller, Laura)
June 27, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MAP)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 *MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Further Support of #15 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Kui Zhu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guiney, Matthew) *Modified to reflect correct event; attorney noticed on 6/27/2019 (SST).
June 25, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Matthew M Guiney and Kevin G Cooper on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 Letter Re Transfer of 8:19-cv-889-CEH from the Middle District of Florida to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-19-cv-4529-PHX-GMS. (MAP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:19-cv-00889 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: 1. The Joint Motion for Transfer of Case to the District of Arizona and Extension of Pending Deadlines #19 is GRANTED. 2. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Phoenix Division of the District of Arizona for all further proceedings. The Clerk is hereby directed to immediately transfer this case to the Phoenix Division of the District of Arizona. 3. All deadlines in this case are stayed. Defendants are not required to respond to the Complaint. 4. Responses to the Lead Plaintiff motions, to the extent not already filed, shall be filed in the District of Arizona by June 28, 2019, or within five (5) business days after the case is opened in the District of Arizona, whichever is later. 5. Within five (5) business days after Lead Plaintiff is appointed by the presiding court in the District of Arizona, the appointed Lead Plaintiff and Defendants shall submit a schedule for the filing of an amended complaint and a briefing schedule on Defendants' response to that complaint. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/21/2019. (BGS) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Armando Martin Campos re #16 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel Selection filed by Armando Martin Campos (Komlossy, Emily) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to transfer case and extension of pending deadlines by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Bugni, Lisa) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Bugni on behalf of Robert L Dingess, Scott Mahoney, Kevin Pollack, Ermanno P Santilli, William W Staunton, Taronis Technologies Inc (Bugni, Lisa) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Vardan Petrosyan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Rosen, Laurence) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel Selection by Armando Martin Campos. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Komlossy, Emily) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Kui Zhu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice, #2 Exhibit Certification, #3 Exhibit Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit WH Resume, #5 Exhibit Prop Order)(Tomchin, Kenneth) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 3 Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/25/2019. (BGS) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 24, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Matthew M. Guiney, appearing on behalf of Chad Hatten (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056306.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Matthew M. Guiney, Kevin G. Cooper to appear pro hac vice. (ARC) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 24, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kevin G. Cooper, appearing on behalf of Chad Hatten (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056306.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Matthew M. Guiney, Kevin G. Cooper to appear pro hac vice. (ARC) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/23/19 by Chad Hatten as to Taronis Technologies Inc. (Tomchin, Kenneth) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/23/19 by Chad Hatten as to Robert L Dingess. (Tomchin, Kenneth) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/23/19 by Chad Hatten as to Scott Mahoney. (Tomchin, Kenneth) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/23/19 by Chad Hatten as to Ermanno P Santilli. (Tomchin, Kenneth) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/23/19 by Chad Hatten as to Kevin Pollack. (Tomchin, Kenneth) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/23/19 by Chad Hatten as to William W Staunton. (Tomchin, Kenneth) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Chad Hatten of Publication of Notice of Pendency of Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tomchin, Kenneth) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 plaintiff's motion for Matthew M. Guiney and Kevin Cooper to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/18/2019. (DMS) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Matthew M. Guiney, Kevin G. Cooper to appear pro hac vice by Chad Hatten. (Tomchin, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/15/2019. (BGS) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/15/2019. (BGS) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-889-T-36TGW. (SJB) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15354354) filed by Chad Hatten. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(Tomchin, Kenneth) [Transferred from flmd on 6/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhu et al v. Taronis Technologies Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Pollack
Represented By: Lisa Bugni
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: Brian Barnes
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ermanno P Santilli
Represented By: Lisa Bugni
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: Brian Barnes
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W Staunton
Represented By: Lisa Bugni
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: Brian Barnes
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Dingess
Represented By: Lisa Bugni
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: Brian Barnes
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taronis Technologies Inc
Represented By: Lisa Bugni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Mahoney
Represented By: Lisa Bugni
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: Brian Barnes
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taronis Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Lisa Bugni
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: Brian Barnes
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Hatten
Represented By: Kevin G Cooper
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Tomchin
Represented By: Matthew M Guiney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kui Zhu
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Tomchin
Represented By: Kevin G Cooper
Represented By: Matthew M Guiney
Represented By: Malcolm Todd Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Armando Martin Campos
Represented By: Emily C Komlossy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vardan Petrosyan
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?