Handy v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Joy Handy
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv04545
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Chantal Jenkins appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Jenkins, Chantal)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration for US Attorney General. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/25/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/25/2019. (LFIG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04545-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Joy Handy. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joy Handy. (Dicus, Kathryn) (BAC)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joy Handy. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handy v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Handy
Represented By: Kathryn Dicus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Chantal Renee Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?