Baker v. ClearOne Advantage LLC
Plaintiff: Frank Baker
Defendant: ClearOne Advantage LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04568
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #10 ), Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Frank Baker. (Frankel, Ty)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Remark: Pro Hac Vice Motions granted for Amber Jackson and Kathleen Pontone on behalf of Defendant ClearOne Advantage, LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
July 19, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Anthony W Kraus III on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Frank Baker: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, MIDR Users Manual, Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction; Preliminary Order upon ClearOne Advantage, LLC on 7/17/19. (Frankel, Ty)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Notice Of Filing Consent To Opt-In To Collective Action by Frank Baker . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frankel, Ty)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on September 24, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/27/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ClearOne Advantage LLC. (KAH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17093780. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04568-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Frank Baker. (Frankel, Ty) (KAH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17093780 filed by Frank Baker. (Frankel, Ty) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. ClearOne Advantage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Baker
Represented By: Ty Derek Frankel
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClearOne Advantage LLC
Represented By: Amber Nicole Jackson
Represented By: Anthony Walter Kraus, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?