Aldridge v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Chase C Aldridge
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv04592
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Chantal Jenkins appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Jenkins, Chantal)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/2/19 (MSA)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/28/19. (EJA)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04592-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Chase C Aldridge. (Slepian, Eric) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (KAH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Chase C Aldridge. (Slepian, Eric)(KAH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Chase C Aldridge. (Slepian, Eric) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldridge v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase C Aldridge
Represented By: Eric Glenn Slepian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Chantal Renee Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?