Ruble v. United Services Automobile Association Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan et al
Plaintiff: Carlotta Lee Ruble
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, United Services Automobile Association Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan and Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2019cv04595
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. (See attached Order for additional details and deadlines). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/26/19. (JAMA)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Services Automobile Association Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan identifying Other Affiliate United Services Automobile Association for United Services Automobile Association Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, United Services Automobile Association Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Unknown Party.(Rademaekers, Iwana)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint(Doc. #13 ) and extending to August 26, 2019, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/13/19. (JAMA)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, United Services Automobile Association Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rademaekers, Iwana)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #11 ) and extending to August 12, 2019, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/31/19. (JAMA)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, United Services Automobile Association Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Unknown Party. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rademaekers, Iwana)
July 29, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Iwana Rademaekers on behalf of defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Carlotta Lee Ruble: Declaration of Certified Mail Service re: Summonses (Docs. 4-1, 4-2), Complaint (Doc. 1), Exhibit 1 (Doc. 1-2), Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (Doc. 3), Civil Coversheet (Doc. 1-1), July 2, 2019 Orders (Docs. 6, 7) upon United Services Automobile Association Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan on 7/9/19; Certified Mail Service upon the Executive Vice President of People Services of the United Services Automobile Association on 7/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt - the Plan, #2 Return Receipt - Plan Administrator)(Ronstadt, Erin) * Modified to clarify type of service and date of service on 7/25/2019 (LAD).
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Carlotta Lee Ruble: Affidavit of Service re: Summons (Doc. 8); Complaint (Doc. 1); Exhibit 1 (Doc. 1-2); Notice re Magistrate Judge (Doc. 3); Civil Coversheet (Doc. 1-1); July 2, 2019 Order (Doc. 6); July 2, 2019 Order (Doc. 7) upon Liberty Life Insurance Company of Boston on July 8, 2019. (Ronstadt, Erin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 27, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/2/19. (JAMA)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/2/19. (JAMA)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Carlotta Lee Ruble. (Ronstadt, Erin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, United Services Automobile Association Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Unknown Party. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17106927. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4595-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Carlotta Lee Ruble. (Ronstadt, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17106927 filed by Carlotta Lee Ruble. (Ronstadt, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruble v. United Services Automobile Association Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlotta Lee Ruble
Represented By: Erin Rose Ronstadt
Represented By: Clayton Warren Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?