Shuman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sharon Shuman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv04603
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles added. Senior Judge James A Teilborg no longer assigned to case. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-19-4603-PHX-CDB. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/6/19. (MAP)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Asim Modi appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Modi, Asim)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. (MSA)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the following deadlines and procedures. Within sixty (60) days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief. Defendant must file an answering brief within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within fifteen (15) days after service of Defendant's answering brief. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/1/19. (MSA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04603-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Sharon Shuman. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KAH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sharon Shuman. (Dicus, Kathryn) (KAH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sharon Shuman. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shuman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Shuman
Represented By: Kathryn Dicus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Asim Modi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?