Sullivan v. Nationwide Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Gregory R Sullivan
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04680
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED ANSWER to #6 Counterclaim by Gregory R Sullivan. (REK)
August 28, 2019 Filing 25 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint filed by Counter Claimant Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Defendant Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Sharlot, Laurence)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the motion to remand (Doc. #9 ) is denied, the motion to allow electronic filing (Doc. #21 ) is denied, and the motion to rule on previously filed motions (Doc. #23 ) is granted in part and denied in part [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/23/19. (MAW)
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Rule on 3 Previously Filed Motions by Gregory R Sullivan. (EJA)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #6 Counterclaim by Gregory R Sullivan.(EJA)
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Gregory R Sullivan. (EJA)
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Gregory R Sullivan. (EJA)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Counter Claimant Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Defendant Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Sharlot, Laurence)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: summons, complaint, certificate, entry of default judgment, dismissal of counterclaim, motion to default upon Nationwide Insurance Company America on 7/24/19. (EJA)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #16 Declaration by Plaintiff Gregory R Sullivan. (EJA)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Mark E. Hartman in Support of Nationwide Insurance Company of America's Opposition to Motion to Remand re: #15 Response to Motion . filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sharlot, Laurence)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Vacate Nationwide Insurance Company of America's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Sharlot, Laurence)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Sullivan's motion for reconsideration (Doc. #13 ) is denied [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/2/19. (MAW)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re: 11 Minute Order by Gregory R Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLQ)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Gregory R Sullivan. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (SLQ)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Defendant having filed its Answer (Doc. #6 ), the Clerk's Office will take no action on the Plaintiff's application for entry of default (Doc. #10 ). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Gregory R Sullivan against Nationwide Insurance Company. (SLQ)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court, MOTION to Vacate Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by Gregory R Sullivan. (SLQ)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for September 11, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 601, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/19/19. (MAW)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Nationwide Insurance Company of America's ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Plaintiff's Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Gregory R Sullivan by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Complaint)(Sharlot, Laurence)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (ARC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 *NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC) *Modified file date from 7/10/19 to 7/11/19 on 7/11/2019 (CEI).
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17146163. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4680-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
July 10, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail re: Summons and Complaint upon Nationwide Insurance Company of America on 6/14/2019. (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/17/2019) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Sharlot, Laurence) (ARC)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-008282. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17146163 filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Sharlot, Laurence) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Nationwide Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Brophy
Represented By: Laurence Randall Sharlot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory R Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?