Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation et al v. United Healthcare Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated, Emergency Physicians Southwest PC, Quantum Healthcare Medical Associates of Arizona PC, Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corp and Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation
Defendant: United Healthcare Incorporated, Unknown Parties, UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits LLC, United Healthcare Solutions LLC, UnitedHealthcare Integrated Services Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Incorporated, United Health Care Services Incorporated, UMR Incorporated and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv04687
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re: #26 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #18 Amended Complaint Notice of Non-Opposition filed by Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated, Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation, Emergency Physicians Southwest PC. (Gallagher, Kristen)
September 5, 2019 Filing 26 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #18 Amended Complaint by UMR Incorporated, United Health Care Services Incorporated, United Healthcare Incorporated, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Integrated Services Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits LLC, UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(West, John)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting the Parties' Stipulation (Doc. #23 ) and extending Defendants UHC Group and UHG's time to file an answer in response to the Amended Complaint (Doc. #18 ) to September 30, 2019, or 20 days from acceptance of service by Defendant UGH, whichever is earlier. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/20/2019. (REK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 24 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated, Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation, Emergency Physicians Southwest PC: Acceptance of Service re: Summons and First Amended Complaint upon UnitedHealth Group, Inc. on August 19, 2019. (Gallagher, Kristen)
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT Amended Complaint by UMR Incorporated, United Health Care Services Incorporated, United Healthcare Incorporated, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Integrated Services Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits LLC, UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(West, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated, Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation, Emergency Physicians Southwest PC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perach, Amanda)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation Regarding Filing of First Amended Complaint (Doc. #17 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a Notice of Filing Amended Complaint pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants response to the First Amended Complaint will be due in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). Defendants are not required to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/13/19. (JAMA)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Submitted by Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated, Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation, Emergency Physicians Southwest PC. (Gallagher, Kristen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation, Emergency Physicians Southwest PC, Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated.(Lundvall, Pat)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION re: #12 Order on Stipulation by Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated, Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation, Emergency Physicians Southwest PC, Quantum Healthcare Medical Associates of Arizona PC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Kristen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated, Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation, Emergency Physicians Southwest PC, Quantum Healthcare Medical Associates of Arizona PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gallagher, Kristen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by UMR Incorporated, United Health Care Services Incorporated, United Healthcare Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Integrated Services Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits LLC, United Healthcare Solutions LLC, United Healthcare of Arizona Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of John West, #2 Exhibit B - Sample claim forms, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jane Stalinski)(True, Nicole)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Remand (Doc. #13 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants UnitedHealthcare, Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona, Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UMR, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Integrated Services, Inc. and UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits, LLC have through and including July 31, 2019, to file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. #8 ). (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/30/19. (JAMA)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Extension of Time to File Response by UMR Incorporated, United Health Care Services Incorporated, United Healthcare Incorporated, United Healthcare Solutions LLC, UnitedHealthcare Integrated Services Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits LLC, UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(True, Nicole)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the Parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (Doc. #11 ) and extending Defendant UHC Group's time to file an answer in response to the Complaint (Doc. #1 -1) to August 7, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/18/19. (JAMA)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by UMR Incorporated, United Health Care Services Incorporated, United Healthcare Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Integrated Services Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits LLC, UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(West, John)
July 16, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Amanda Perach on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated, Quantum Healthcare Medical Associates of Arizona PC, Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation, Emergency Physicians Southwest PC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated, Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation, Emergency Physicians Southwest PC, Quantum Healthcare Medical Associates of Arizona PC. (Gallagher, Kristen)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated, Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation, Emergency Physicians Southwest PC, Quantum Healthcare Medical Associates of Arizona PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Kristen)
July 12, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Kristen T Gallagher on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 12, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Pat Lundvall on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 9, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/11/19. (JAMA)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/11/19. (JAMA)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated, Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corp, Emergency Physicians Southwest PC, Quantum Healthcare Medical Associates of Arizona PC. (KAH)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17147740. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04687-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UMR Incorporated, United Health Care Services Incorporated, United Healthcare Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Integrated Services Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits LLC, UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Incorporated. (West, John) (KAH)
July 10, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Incorporated on 6/11/19 (filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/17/19.) Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon United Health Care Services Incorporated on 6/11/19 (filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/17/19.) Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon UMR Incorporated on 6/11/19 (filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/17/19.) Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon UnitedHealthcare Integrated Services Incorporated on 6/11/19 (filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/17/19.) Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits LLC on 6/11/19 (filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/17/19.) (KAH) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-004510. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17147740 filed by UnitedHealthcare Integrated Services Incorporated, UMR Incorporated, United Health Care Services Incorporated, United Healthcare Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits LLC. (West, John) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation et al v. United Healthcare Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Incorporated
Represented By: Nicole Marie True
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits LLC
Represented By: Nicole Marie True
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Integrated Services Incorporated
Represented By: Nicole Marie True
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Incorporated
Represented By: Nicole Marie True
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Care Services Incorporated
Represented By: Nicole Marie True
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR Incorporated
Represented By: Nicole Marie True
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Nicole Marie True
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Dennis Emergency Medical Group Incorporated
Represented By: Pat Lundvall
Represented By: Kristen T Gallagher
Represented By: Amanda M Perach
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergency Physicians Southwest PC
Represented By: Pat Lundvall
Represented By: Kristen T Gallagher
Represented By: Amanda M Perach
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quantum Healthcare Medical Associates of Arizona PC
Represented By: Pat Lundvall
Represented By: Kristen T Gallagher
Represented By: Amanda M Perach
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corp
Represented By: Pat Lundvall
Represented By: Kristen T Gallagher
Represented By: Amanda M Perach
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergency Group of Arizona Professional Corporation
Represented By: Pat Lundvall
Represented By: Kristen T Gallagher
Represented By: Amanda M Perach
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?