Standorf v. Christie's Cabaret et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Standorf
Defendant: Christie's Cabaret, Unknown Cooper, Steve Cooper and Cindy Cooper
Case Number: 2:2019cv04700
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Notice (Other) filed by Kelly Standorf. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time pursuant to the Stipulated Motion to Extend the Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Defend Against Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #12 ) filed by Plaintiff and Defendant Christie's Cabaret and extending Defendant Christie's Cabaret's time to file an answer in response to the Complaint (Doc. #1 -1) to 09/17/19. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. See order for details. Signed by Judge John J. Tuchi on 7/22/19. (NKS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE re: of Service of Order by Kelly Standorf re: #8 Order . (Foster, Troy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Christie's Cabaret. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fischbach, William)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Steve Cooper: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 7/19/2019 to Steve Cooper . (Fischbach, William)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Cindy Cooper: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 7/19/2019 to Cindy Cooper . (Fischbach, William)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 11, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/15/19. (JAMA)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/15/19. (JAMA)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Christie's Cabaret. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Fischbach, William)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Christie's Cabaret. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Christie's Cabaret. (MFR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Christie's Cabaret. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case and a Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet when filing a notice of removal. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17154567. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4700-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-055472. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17154567 filed by Christie's Cabaret. (Fischbach, William) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standorf v. Christie's Cabaret et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie's Cabaret
Represented By: Marcos Alejandro Tapia
Represented By: William Morris Fischbach, III
Represented By: Amy Dody Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Standorf
Represented By: Troy Patrick Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?