Polk v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Patricia A Polk
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv04705
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Patricia A Polk: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons&Complaint Service effectuated via certified mail upon U.S. Atty's Office, Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General on 7/25/2019, 7/26/2019, 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 summons executed with proof of service)(Ayodele, Elizabeth)*Modified to add dates on 8/26/2019 (GMP).
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Margaret Branick-Abilla appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Branick-Abilla, Margaret)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BAS)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 7/16/2019. (RMW)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY: Within 60 days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief. Defendant must file an answering brief within 30 days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within 15 days after service of Defendant's answering brief. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/15/19. (LAD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04705-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Patricia A Polk. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) (BAC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Patricia A Polk. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) (BAC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patricia A Polk. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Polk
Represented By: Elizabeth Oluwafunmi Ayodele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Margaret I Branick-Abilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?