Caspi v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Limor Caspi
Defendant: Economy Preferred Insurance Company and Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv04707
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Economy Preferred Insurance Company. (Fleming, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: Plaintiff's First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Limor Caspi . (Grisoni, Thomas) *Modified to correct event on 8/13/2019 (REK).
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: Plaintiff's First Amended Initial Disclosure Statement by Limor Caspi . (Grisoni, Thomas) *Modified to correct event on 7/30/2019 (REK).
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Plaintiff's Notice of Service of First Amended Answers to MIDP Discovery Requests filed by Plaintiff Limor Caspi. (Grisoni, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/3/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. See attachment for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/24/19. (CLB)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/24/19. (CLB)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4707-PHX-DJH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Economy Preferred Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Economy Fire & Casualty Company for Economy Preferred Insurance Company. (Fleming, Elizabeth)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Economy Preferred Insurance Company.(Fleming, Elizabeth)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Economy Preferred Insurance Company. (MFR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Economy Preferred Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17156640. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4707-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MFR)
July 12, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Acceptance of Service re: First Amended Complaint upon Economy Preferred Insurance Company on 7/1/2019 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/3/2019). (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-094501. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17156640 filed by Economy Preferred Insurance Company. (Fleming, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caspi v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economy Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limor Caspi
Represented By: Thomas Alberto Grisoni
Represented By: Michael Lee York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?