Declements v. HealthMarkets Insurance Agency Incorporated
Plaintiff: Daniel Declements
Defendant: HealthMarkets Insurance Agency Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv04710
Filed: July 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 11/8/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/6/19. (EJA)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HealthMarkets Insurance Agency Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent HealthMarkets Group, Corporate Parent HealthMarkets Incorporated, Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for HealthMarkets Insurance Agency Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by HealthMarkets Insurance Agency Incorporated.(Bressler, Stephen)
September 5, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Carolyn A DeLone, Adam K Levin on behalf of Defendant HealthMarkets Insurance Agency Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting a one-time extension. Defendant shall have to and including September 6, 2019 in which to file its answer and/or responsive pleading. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/5/19. (EJA)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by HealthMarkets Insurance Agency Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Stephen)
July 18, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Stefan Coleman and Avi Kaufman on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daniel Declements: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Kim Hightower at CT Corporation System on 07/17/2019. (Brown, Nathanael)
July 17, 2019 Remark: Out of state attorneys notified of admission requirements; deadline to respond 08162019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 14, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/15/19. (EJA)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to HealthMarkets Insurance Agency Incorporated. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
July 14, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17158734. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4710-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
July 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Declements. (Brown, Nathanael) (DLC)
July 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17158734 filed by Daniel Declements. (Brown, Nathanael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Declements v. HealthMarkets Insurance Agency Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthMarkets Insurance Agency Incorporated
Represented By: Carolyn A DeLone
Represented By: Adam K Levin
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Declements
Represented By: Stefan Louis Coleman
Represented By: Avi Kaufman
Represented By: Nathanael Melvin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?