Scott v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Robert Alan Scott
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv04714
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robert Alan Scott: Notice of Service re: Summons upon William Barr, US Attorney General (08/08/19); Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (08/05/19); Michael Bailey, US Attorney for the District of Arizona (08/02/19) on 08/08/19; 08/05/19; 08/02/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wyeth McAdam appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (McAdam, S)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. See attached Order for deadlines and details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/18/19. (JAMA)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 16, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/18/19. (JAMA)
July 18, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Received: $ 400.00 receipt number 0970-17175436. (Caldwell, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee of $400.00 within 14 days of the date of this Order or this action will be terminated. The Clerk shall terminate this action if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/18/19. (DXD)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04714-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Robert Alan Scott. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (KAH)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Robert Alan Scott. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (KAH)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robert Alan Scott. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Alan Scott
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: S Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?