Claflin v. Wilkie
Plaintiff: Nancy Claflin
Defendant: Robert L Wilkie
Case Number: 2:2019cv04718
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 *Notice- Summons sent by certified mail to Michael Bailey, U.S. Attorney for the District of Arizona; William Barr, Attorney General of the United States; Robert L. Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs on 07/22/2019 and 08/23/2019. (Carter, Adam) *Modified on 8/28/2019 to correct event type (MSA).
August 7, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Adam Augustine Carter on behalf of Plaintiff Nancy Claflin. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 5, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Robert Scott Oswald on behalf of Plaintiff Nancy Claflin. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 16, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/17/19. (JAMA)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/17/19. (JAMA)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Nancy Claflin. (King, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Nancy Claflin. (King, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert L Wilkie. (BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17161538. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04718-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR) Modified on 7/16/2019 (BAR).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Nancy Claflin. (King, William) (BAR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17161538 filed by Nancy Claflin. (King, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claflin v. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Claflin
Represented By: Adam Augustine Carter
Represented By: R Scott Oswald
Represented By: William Fleming King
Represented By: Robert Scott Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?