Murphy-Richardson #333262 v. Arizona, State of
Plaintiff: Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Case Number: 2:2019cv04721
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #8 ) is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 3.4 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. (See document for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 9/10/19. (SLQ)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Titled: Request for Waiver of all Fees & Costs Due to Government Concealment and Fault in Cause of Action) by Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. (2 pages) (REK)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION/Petition for Injunction by Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. (13 pages) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service) (REK)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Clarify, MOTION to Amend/Correct by Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. (7 pages) (REK)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Relief from Judgment by Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. (10 pages) (REK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (REK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/Request for Copies of E-Filed Docs. by Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. (1 page) (REK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT ("Defendant Request for Injunction against Retaliation and Harrassment") filed by Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. (15 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy-Richardson #333262 v. Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?