Mohammed et al v. Naini et al
Plaintiff: Mohammed Taha Mohammed and Mohammed Al Ajaj
Defendant: Hamid Afzalian Naini, Medicare Trans LLC and Mina Kassaeian Naini
Case Number: 2:2019cv04726
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 Defendants' ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Medicare Trans LLC, Hamid Afzalian Naini, Mina Kassaeian Naini.(Hertzog, Erin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Mohammed Al Ajaj, Mohammed Taha Mohammed . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Redline First Amended Complaint)(Enoch, Nicholas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #16 Amended Complaint filed by Mohammed Al Ajaj, Mohammed Taha Mohammed. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Medicare Trans LLC, Hamid Afzalian Naini, Mina Kassaeian Naini filed by Mohammed Taha Mohammed, Mohammed Al Ajaj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Feltre, Corey)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/2/2019. (MMO)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 8/1/2019 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/31/2019. (MMO)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Service of Orders by Mohammed Al Ajaj, Mohammed Taha Mohammed . (Feltre, Corey)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/29/2019. (MMO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Douglas L Rayes. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4726-PHX-DLR. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Medicare Trans LLC, Hamid Afzalian Naini, Mina Kassaeian Naini. (Hertzog, Erin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 *STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Medicare Trans LLC, Hamid Afzalian Naini, Mina Kassaeian Naini. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint)(Hertzog, Erin) *Modified to reflect correct event; attorney noticed on 7/25/2019 (SST).
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Errata re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Medicare Trans LLC, Hamid Afzalian Naini, Mina Kassaeian Naini.. (Hertzog, Erin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Hamid Afzalian Naini, Medicare Trans LLC, Mina Kassaeian Naini. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Medicare Trans LLC. (ARC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17164411. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4726-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (ARC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-008287. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17164411 filed by Mina Kassaeian Naini, Hamid Afzalian Naini, Medicare Trans LLC.(Hertzog, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammed et al v. Naini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Taha Mohammed
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Corey R Feltre
Represented By: Stanley Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Al Ajaj
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Corey R Feltre
Represented By: Stanley Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamid Afzalian Naini
Represented By: Erin A Hertzog
Represented By: Colin Wittman Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicare Trans LLC
Represented By: Erin A Hertzog
Represented By: Colin Wittman Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mina Kassaeian Naini
Represented By: Erin A Hertzog
Represented By: Colin Wittman Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?