Verduzco v. Mulligan
Plaintiff: Susana E Verduzco
Defendant: Kimberly A Mulligan and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04745
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Mary Hyduke-Rundall)(Piensook, Kwan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Re-consider Sanctions re: #9 Order on Motion by Susana E Verduzco. (LAD) (62 pages)
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE re: #14 Response to Removal of Case by Defendant United States of America. (Piensook, Kwan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE re: #13 Response to MIDP Project General Order by Defendant United States of America. (Piensook, Kwan)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for subpoena (Doc. #15 ) is denied without prejudice [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/2/19. (MAW)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Susana E Verduzco. (LAD) (26 pages)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Subpoena by Susana E Verduzco. (LAD) (4 pages)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal by Plaintiff Susana E Verduzco. (LAD) (36 pages, entitled Response to Removal of Case)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE re: #10 Order by Plaintiff Susana E Verduzco. (LAD) (4 pages, entitled Response to MIDP Project General Order)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Certification of Meet and Confer by United States of America re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Letter dated June 13, 2019, #2 Exhibit B: Letter June 20, 2019)(Piensook, Kwan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Plaintiff's SF-95 Form)(Piensook, Kwan)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for sanctions (Doc. #7 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/19/19. (MAW)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 * SUPPLEMENTAL Supportive Documents re: #7 MOTION to Award Sanctions by Plaintiff Susana E Verduzco. (NOTE: Filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/5/19 and docketed in District Court pursuant to #6 Notice). (LAD) * Modified to correct text on 7/19/2019 (LAD).
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 * MOTION to Award Sanctions by Susana E Verduzco. (NOTE: Filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/3/19 and docketed in District Court pursuant to #6 Notice). (LAD) * Modified to correct text on 7/19/2019 (LAD).
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Pending Motion by Kimberly A Mulligan re: #1 Notice of Removal re: [1-4] Exhibit B: Plaintiff's Motion to Award Sanctions. (Piensook, Kwan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re: Substitution of the United States for Defendant Kimberly Mulligan by Kimberly A Mulligan . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Scope of Employment Certification)(Piensook, Kwan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04745-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-007642 filed by Kimberly A Mulligan. (Piensook, Kwan) (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Docket, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verduzco v. Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A Mulligan
Represented By: Kwan Piensook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Kwan Piensook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susana E Verduzco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?