Malachuk v. Wright Medical Technology Incorporated
Plaintiff: Michael Malachuk
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv04765
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE re: of Service of Preliminary Order and MIDP by Michael Malachuk re: #17 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions, Set Deadlines . (Leshner, Stephen)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 17, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not beenserved pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P. Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4765-PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory L Braddock on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Braddock, Cory)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Christensen Jones on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Jones, Jacob)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michael Malachuk: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 7/29/19 to WRight Medical Technology, Inc . (Leshner, Stephen) * Modified to correct date sent from 8/6/19 to 7/29/19 on 8/12/2019 (LAD).
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for August 26, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order that Michael Malachuk show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/26/2019 at 04:00 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H Saunders on behalf of Michael Malachuk. (Saunders, Joseph)
July 22, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Joseph H Saunders on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17182177. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4765-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Michael Malachuk. (Leshner, Stephen) (MFR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17182177 filed by Michael Malachuk. (Leshner, Stephen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malachuk v. Wright Medical Technology Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Malachuk
Represented By: Stephen I Leshner
Represented By: Joseph H Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Incorporated
Represented By: Jacob Christensen Jones
Represented By: Cory L Braddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?