Vargas et al v. Phoenix Indian Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Vargas and Yvonne Vargas
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Dignity Health and Phoenix Indian Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv04871
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Stipulation for Dismissal #8 is granted. This action is dismissed without prejudice in its entirety. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/22/2019. (LMR)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dignity Health. (Isban, Mary)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Yvonne Vargas. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Yvonne Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Donald)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Notice of Service of Discovery filed by Yvonne Vargas. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 *NOTICE of Service of #5 Preliminary Order filed by Yvonne Vargas. (Smith, Donald) *Modified to correct event and add document link on 8/6/2019 (REK).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Dignity Health. (KAH)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04871-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
August 1, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED: ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dignity Health. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES*** (KAH)
August 1, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial, Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration upon Phoenix Indian Medical Center on 2/1/19 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 2/19/19.); Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial, Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration upon Dignity Health on 2/1/19 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 2/19/19.) (KAH) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-056345 filed by Phoenix Indian Medical Center. (Tinsley, Laurence) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Verification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas et al v. Phoenix Indian Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Vargas
Represented By: Donald H Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Vargas
Represented By: Donald H Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health
Represented By: Mary G Isban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Indian Medical Center
Represented By: Laurence G Tinsley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?