Manhas v. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lauri Manhas
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2019cv04906
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 29 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC: Certificate of Service re: Subpoena to Produce Documents upon City of Scottsdale Police Department on 09/27/2019. (Petersen, Bradley)
September 23, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Petersen, Bradley)
September 20, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #26 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Lauri Manhas. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Kyle Gurwell but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Jonathan Michaels. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
September 20, 2019 Filing 26 *NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Lauri Manhas. (Michaels, Jonathan) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violations on 9/23/2019 (SST).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Via Telephone at Pretrial Scheduling Conference (Doc. #24 ). Counsel for Plaintiff, Kyle Gurwell, may appear telephonically at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for October 15, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. (Arizona time). Chambers will e-mail dial-in information to Mr. Gurwell prior to the conference. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/16/19. (JAMA)
August 29, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Via Telephone at Pretrial Scheduling Conference by Lauri Manhas. (Michaels, Jonathan)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference (Doc. #22 ) and vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set in this matter for October 7, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED resetting the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for October 15, 2019, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 505, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003, before Judge John J. Tuchi. All other items in the Court's Order of August 23, 2019 (Doc. #21 ), remain in effect. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/28/19. (JAMA) *Modified to add document linkage on 8/29/2019 (RMV).
August 28, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petersen, Bradley)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/23/2019. (JAMA)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 , #18 Motions to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Bradley W. Petersen and Anne E. Holmgren are substituted as counsel for Defendant in place of Attorney Emma E Jacobson and Matthew R Rogers. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/22/19. (DXD)
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daimler North America Corporation, Corporate Parent Daimler AG for Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Petersen, Bradley)
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 *MOTION to Substitute Attorney - Anne E. Holmgren substituting for Emma E Jacobson for Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. . (Petersen, Bradley) *Modified to reflect correct event; attorney noticed on 8/21/2019 (SST).
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 *MOTION to Substitute Attorney - Bradley W. Petersen substituting for Matthew R Rogers for Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. . (Petersen, Bradley) *Modified to reflect correct event; attorney noticed on 8/21/2019 (SST).
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLCS ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC.(Petersen, Bradley)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley W Petersen on behalf of Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Petersen, Bradley)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 -1) by August 23, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/16/19. (JAMA)
August 16, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jonathan Ambrose Michaels on behalf of Plaintiff Lauri Manhas. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kyle Norman Gurwell on behalf of Plaintiff Lauri Manhas. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/8/19. (JAMA)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MAP)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 Letter Re Transfer of 2:19-cv-6368-CJC (KS) from the Central District of California to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-19-4906-PHX-JJT. (MAP)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-06368 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER THE ACTION TO THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA #8 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS ORDERED that Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Motion to Transfer #6 theAction to the District of Arizona is granted. Case transferred to the District of Arizona. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona filed by Plaintiff Lauri Manhas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Michaels, Jonathan) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Rogers, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Huth, #2 Declaration of Matthew R. Rogers, #3 Exhibit A. to Declaration of Matthew R. Rogers, #4 Proposed Order) (Rogers, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, identifying Daimler AG. (Rogers, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Rogers, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV20692 Receipt No: 0973-24134698 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Remainder of State Court File) (Attorney Matthew R Rogers added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Rogers, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, filed by plaintiff Lauri Manhas. (Filed in state court 5/13/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manhas v. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauri Manhas
Represented By: Jonathan Ambrose Michaels
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Represented By: Matthew R Rogers
Represented By: Emma E Jacobson
Represented By: Bradley W Petersen
Represented By: Anne E Holmgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?