Gregory v. Whitney et al
Plaintiff: Jeane Gregory
Defendant: Richard Whitney and Gust Rosenfeld PLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04909
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/23/19. (GMP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 35 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #34 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Jeane Gregory. (GMP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 34 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jeane Gregory. (GMP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Jeane Gregory. (GMP)
September 6, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Defendant's #30 Reply to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Jeane Gregory. (SST) (15 pages)
August 30, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeane Gregory. (EJA)
August 30, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gust Rosenfeld PLC, Richard Whitney. (Wirken, Charles)
August 29, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jeane Gregory. (GMP)
August 20, 2019 Filing 26 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Wirken, Charles) *Modified to correct event on 8/21/2019 (DXD).
August 19, 2019 Filing 28 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Jeane Gregory. (DXD)
August 19, 2019 Filing 27 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Jeane Gregory. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (DXD)
August 16, 2019 Filing 25 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Jeane Gregory. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (DXD)
August 15, 2019 Filing 24 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #23 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant Gust Rosenfeld's Statement of Facts by Defendant Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6)(Wirken, Charles)
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re: #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Wirken, Charles)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Charles W. Wirken is substituted as counsel of record for Defendant in place of Attorneys David W Long, Emily M Meeker, and Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/14/19. (DXD)
August 8, 2019 Filing 21 * MOTION to Substitute Attorney Motion for Substitution of Counsel by Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wirken, Charles) * Modified to remove ex parte designation from text on 8/9/2019 (LAD).
August 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MAP)
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MAP)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: Transfer of 4:19-cv-81-FL from the Eastern District of North Carolina to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-19-4909-PHX-GMS. (MAP)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00081 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Defendant Gust Rosenfeld's alternative motion to transfer venue #10 is granted. Where the court lacks personal jurisdiction over defendant Gust Rosenfeld, and where venue is proper in Arizona, this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/7/2019. (Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina.) (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeane Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arizona Minute Entry 11-8-11, #2 Exhibit B - Emails from Whitney and Gust Rosenfield, PLC) (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative MOTION to Change Venue. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative MOTION to Change Venue filed by Jeane Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proof of Diversity of Citizenship, #2 Exhibit B- Glaser and Whitney/Rosenfeld PLC Emails, #3 Exhibit C- Petition for Order to Show Cause, #4 Exhibit D- Copy of minute entry from Maricopa County Superior Court of Arizona, #5 Exhibit E- Copy of mission, vision and core values of the State Bar of Arizona, #6 Exhibit F- California "Last Will and Testament" of Susana Sabado) (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Jeane Gregory as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative MOTION to Change Venue. Response due by 7/15/2019. (Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina.) (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Defendant Richard Whitney by Gust Rosenfeld PLC (Meeker, Emily) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative MOTION to Change Venue filed by Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles W. Wirken) (Meeker, Emily) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, MOTION to Change Venue filed by Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Meeker, Emily) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Gust Rosenfeld PLC (Meeker, Emily) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow on behalf of Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Zinkow, Nathaniel) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily M. Meeker on behalf of Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Meeker, Emily) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by David William Long on behalf of Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Long, David) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service filed by Jeane Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS receipts, #2 Exhibit Proof of service) (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gust Rosenfeld PLC, Richard Whitney. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Gust Rosenfeld) Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Jeane Gregory. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Jeane Gregory. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gust Rosenfeld PLC, Richard Whitney (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number NEW001013), filed by Jeane Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 8/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Whitney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeane Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gust Rosenfeld PLC
Represented By: David W Long
Represented By: Charles William Wirken
Represented By: Emily M Meeker
Represented By: Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?