Monarch Content Management LLC et al v. Arizona Department of Gaming et al
Plaintiff: Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC and Laurel Racing Association Incorporated a Maryland corporation doing business as Laurel Park
Defendant: Ted Vogt, Chuck Coolidge, JC McClintock, Rory S Goree, Tom Lawless, Arizona Department of Gaming, Arizona Racing Commission and Rudy Casillas
Intervenor Defendant: Arizona Downs LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04928
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED denying the Motion to Intervene filed by Arizona Downs, LLC (Doc. #42 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting oral argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #20 ) on October 30, 2019, at 1:30 p.m., before District Judge John J. Tuchi in Courtroom 505, Sandra Day O'Connor Federal Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. The Court will hear only legal argument on Plaintiffs' Motion; no new evidence need be presented [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/4/19. (MAW)
October 3, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Arizona Department of Gaming, Arizona Racing Commission, Rudy Casillas, Chuck Coolidge, Rory S Goree, Tom Lawless, JC McClintock, Ted Vogt. (Delnegro, Elizabeth)
September 24, 2019 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #42 MOTION to Intervene filed by Arizona Downs LLC. (Basile, Thomas)
September 23, 2019 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #40 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Motion to Set Return Hearing (Expedited Consideration Requested) filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Cloar, Vail)
September 17, 2019 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re: #42 MOTION to Intervene filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
September 16, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE to #40 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Arizona Department of Gaming, Arizona Racing Commission, Rudy Casillas, Chuck Coolidge, Rory S Goree, Tom Lawless, JC McClintock, Ted Vogt. (Delnegro, Elizabeth) *Modified on 9/17/2019 to correct event type (MSA).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc. #48 ). The due date for Plaintiffs to respond to Arizona Downs, LLC's Motion to Intervene (Doc. #42 ) is extended to September 17, 2019. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/9/19. (JAMA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 50 *NOTICE of Errata of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Scott Daruty (attached as Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support Temporary Restraining Order [Doc.49]) by Plaintiff Monarch Content Management LLC, Laurel Racing Association Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Claus, Scot) *Modified on 9/10/2019 to add filer (MSA).
September 6, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Notice Reply in Support of Application for TRO filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
September 5, 2019 Filing 48 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Intervene by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Stipulation to Extend)(Claus, Scot)
September 3, 2019 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Arizona Department of Gaming, Arizona Racing Commission, Rudy Casillas, Chuck Coolidge, Rory S Goree, Tom Lawless, JC McClintock, Ted Vogt.(Irvine, Patrick)
August 30, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Notice filed by Arizona Department of Gaming, Arizona Racing Commission, Rudy Casillas, Chuck Coolidge, Rory S Goree, Tom Lawless, JC McClintock, Ted Vogt. (Irvine, Patrick)
August 30, 2019 Filing 45 LODGED Proposed Motion to Dismiss re: #42 MOTION to Intervene . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Arizona Downs, LLC. (Basile, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 44 LODGED Proposed Opposition of Arizona Downs to the Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order re: #42 MOTION to Intervene . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Arizona Downs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David Auther)(Basile, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 43 LODGED Proposed Answer of Arizona Downs, LLC to the Complaint re: #42 MOTION to Intervene . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Arizona Downs, LLC. (Basile, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Intervene by Arizona Downs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Arizona Downs, LLC's Motion to Intervene)(Basile, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas James Basile on behalf of Arizona Downs, LLC. (Basile, Thomas)
August 21, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Motion to Set Return Hearing by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause)(Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 39 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons (Doc. 17), Complaint (Doc. 1), Application for TRO (Doc. 20), Proposed TRO (Doc. 20-1), and Notice to Parties (Doc. 3) upon Tom Lawless on 08/13/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 38 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons (Doc. 17), Complaint (Doc. 1), Application for TRO (Doc. 20), Proposed TRO (Doc. 20-1), and Notice to Parties (Doc. 3) upon Ted Vogt on 08/13/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 37 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons (Doc. 17), Complaint (Doc. 1), Application for TRO (Doc. 20), Proposed TRO (Doc. 20-1), and Notice to Parties (Doc. 3) upon Rudy Casillas on 08/13/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 36 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons (Doc. 17), Complaint (Doc. 1), Application for TRO (Doc. 20), Proposed TRO (Doc. 20-1), and Notice to Parties (Doc. 3) upon Rory S. Gore on 08/13/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 35 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons (Doc. 17), Complaint (Doc. 1), Application for TRO (Doc. 20), Proposed TRO (Doc. 20-1), and Notice to Parties (Doc. 3) upon J.C. McClintock on 08/13/19. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 34 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons (Doc. 17), Complaint (Doc. 1), Application for TRO (Doc. 20), Proposed TRO (Doc. 20-1), and Notice to Parties (Doc. 3) upon Chuck Coolidge on 08/13/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 33 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons (Doc. 17), Complaint (Doc. 1), Application for TRO (Doc. 20), Proposed TRO (Doc. 20-1), and Notice to Parties (Doc. 3) upon Arizona Racing Commission on 08/13/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 32 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons (Doc. 17), Complaint (Doc. 1), Application for TRO (Doc. 20), Proposed TRO (Doc. 20-1), and Notice to Parties (Doc. 3) upon Arizona Deparment of Gaming on 08/13/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 31 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Order dated 8/14/19 (Doc. 21) upon Tom Lawless on 08/15/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 30 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Order dated 8/14/19 (Doc. 21) upon Ted Vogt on 08/15/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 29 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Order dated 8/14/19 (Doc. 21) upon Rudy Casillas on 08/15/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 28 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Order dated 8-14-19 (Doc. 21) upon Rory S. Gore on 08/15/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 27 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Order dated 8-14-19 (Doc. 21) upon J.C. McClintock on 08/15/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 26 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Order dated 8-14-19 (Doc. 21) upon Chuck Coolidge on 08/15/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 25 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Order dated 8-14-19 (Doc. 21) upon Arizona Racing Commission on 08/15/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 24 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Order dated 8-14-19 (Doc. 21) upon Arizona Deparment of Gaming on 08/15/2019. (Claus, Scot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #22 Declaration filed by Monarch Content Management LLC, Laurel Racing Association Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Sheila Rath re: #1 Complaint, #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Notice, #21 Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings by Plaintiffs Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of the Summons and Complaint (Doc. #1 ), the Motion (Doc. #20 ), and this Order on Defendants as soon as possible, and in any event by the end of the day on August 16, 2019. Plaintiffs shall file certificates of service on the docket within two days of service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #20 ) by August 30, 2019, and Plaintiffs shall file a Reply by September 6, 2019.1 In their briefs, the parties shall include a proposed bond amount under Rule 65(c) in the event the Court grants Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/14/19. (JAMA)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Notice by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order Issued with Notice)(Claus, Scot)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on November 8, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/12/19. (JAMA)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/12/19. (JAMA)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Submitted by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Submitted by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (MCO)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17262211. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4928-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17262211 filed by Laurel Racing Association Incorporated, Monarch Content Management LLC. (Claus, Scot) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monarch Content Management LLC et al v. Arizona Department of Gaming et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Vogt
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Delnegro
Represented By: Patrick Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Coolidge
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Delnegro
Represented By: Patrick Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JC McClintock
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Delnegro
Represented By: Patrick Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory S Goree
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Delnegro
Represented By: Patrick Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Lawless
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Delnegro
Represented By: Patrick Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Gaming
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Delnegro
Represented By: Patrick Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Racing Commission
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Delnegro
Represented By: Patrick Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Casillas
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Delnegro
Represented By: Patrick Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel Racing Association Incorporated
Represented By: Vail Choji Bryant Cloar
Represented By: Scot L Claus
Represented By: Holly Marie Zoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monarch Content Management LLC
Represented By: Vail Choji Bryant Cloar
Represented By: Scot L Claus
Represented By: Holly Marie Zoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel Racing Association Incorporated a Maryland corporation doing business as Laurel Park
Represented By: Vail Choji Bryant Cloar
Represented By: Scot L Claus
Represented By: Holly Marie Zoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Arizona Downs LLC
Represented By: Thomas James Basile
Represented By: Kory A Langhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?