Medrano v. Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Medrano
Defendant: Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC, Bank of America NA, Unknown Parties, Recontrust Company and Carrington Foreclosure Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04988
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Referring Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 Joinder re: #20 Reply to Response to Motion Defendant Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC's Notice of Joinder in Co-Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Recontrust Company's Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss and Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Carrington Foreclosure Services LLC. filed by Carrington Foreclosure Services LLC. (Wozniak, Lukasz)
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Bank of America NA, Recontrust Company. (Pollock, Bradley)
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Reservation of Right to filed by Tracy Medrano. (REK)
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #15 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Tracy Medrano. (REK)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #16 Joinder filed by Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 Joinder re: #15 First MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC's Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Co-Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Recontrust Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC. (Wozniak, Lukasz)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Dismiss Case by Bank of America NA, Recontrust Company. (Pollock, Bradley)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that this matter has been reassigned by the Clerk of Court, by random lot, to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza, United States District Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-19-04988-PHX-DWL. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/3/2019. (LFIG)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC, #11 Request filed by Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Reservation of Right to filed by Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Carrington Holding Company, LLC for Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC. (Wozniak, Lukasz)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST re: Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Defendant Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC. (Wozniak, Lukasz)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Reservation of Right to Join in Co-Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Reconstruct Company's Motions to Dismiss by Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC. (Wozniak, Lukasz)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 9/9/2019 for Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Reconstruct Company to respond to the complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/27/2019. (LFIG)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Bank of America NA, Recontrust Company. (Pollock, Bradley)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Recontrust Company identifying Bank of America Corporation as a corporate party . (Pollock, Bradley) *Modified to add corporate party on 8/22/2019 (EJA).
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America NA identifying BANA Holding Corporation, BAC North America Holding Company, NB Holdings Corporation and Bank of America Corporation as corporate parties. (Pollock, Bradley) *Modified to add corporate parties on 8/22/2019 (EJA).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED directing any party appearing pro se to become familiar with the Local Rules and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/20/2019. (LFIG)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Bank of America NA, Recontrust Company. (BAC)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number CV2019-009912. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04988-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-009912. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17297198 filed by Recontrust Company, Bank of America NA. (Pollock, Bradley) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medrano v. Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Foreclosure Services, LLC
Represented By: Lukasz Iwo Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Bradley Ray Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Bradley Ray Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Foreclosure Services LLC
Represented By: Lukasz Iwo Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Medrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?