Smeltzer v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Scott Smeltzer
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv05114
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation. Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America shall have to November 28, 2019 in which to file a Response to the Complaint in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/29/19. (EJA)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmstrom, Kristina)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (WLP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Scott Smeltzer. (Breazeale, Noah)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only), #1 Complaint Automated Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Scott Smeltzer. (Breazeale, Noah)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on December 9, 2019. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/9/19. (MSA)
September 9, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Noah Breazeale on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Smeltzer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Scott Smeltzer. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17369326. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5114-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Scott Smeltzer. (Breazeale, Noah) (ARC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17369326 filed by Scott Smeltzer. (Breazeale, Noah) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smeltzer v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Kristina Novotny Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Smeltzer
Represented By: Noah Breazeale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?