Patel et al v. Willms et al
Plaintiff: Piyushkumar Patel and Dipikaben Piyushkumar Patel
Defendant: Jonathan Randall Willms and Sun Life Family Health Center Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv05139
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for October 21. 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order that Dipikaben Piyushkumar Patel, Piyushkumar Patel show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/21/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Redacted against All Defendants filed by Piyushkumar Patel, Dipikaben Piyushkumar Patel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Cullan, Gene)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Upon the Court's own review of the record, and the minor's full name appearing on the Civil Cover Sheet in violation of Rule 5.2(a)(3), IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to seal Doc. #1 and the associated attachments thereto; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing counsel to file a redacted version of the pleading and associated attachments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/18/19. (SLQ)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sun Life Family Health Center Incorporated, Jonathan Randall Willms. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Dipikaben Piyushkumar Patel, Piyushkumar Patel. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17384452. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5139-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Dipikaben Piyushkumar Patel, Piyushkumar Patel. (Cullan, Gene) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 *COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17384452 filed by Piyushkumar Patel, Dipikaben Piyushkumar Patel. (Cullan, Gene) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP) *Modified to seal per order #7 on 9/18/2019 (SLQ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. Willms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piyushkumar Patel
Represented By: Gene Michael Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dipikaben Piyushkumar Patel
Represented By: Gene Michael Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Randall Willms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Family Health Center Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?