LNS Enterprises LLC et al v. Continental Motors Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC, Peter Spanganberg, LNS Enterprises LLC and Lynn Spanganberg
Defendant: Professional Air, Continental Motors Group Limited, Falcon Executive Aviation Incorporated, Van Bortel Aircraft Incorporated, Textron Aviation Incorporated, Unknown Parties, Chandler Aviation Services Incorporated, Lone Mountain Aviation Incorporated, Kelly Aerospace Thermal Systems LLC, Cessna Aircraft Company, Skylancer Aviation LLC, Columbia Aircraft Manufacturing Corporation, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated, Leading Edge Aviation Incorporated, Aviation Industry Corporation of China and Continental Motors Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv05221
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 54 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Textron Aviation Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Textron Aviation Incorporated, Cessna Aircraft Company. (Pugel, Rachael) *Modified to add additional filer on 11/6/2019 (REK).
October 30, 2019 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Professional Air. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Gwil Evans)(Glady, Edward)
October 29, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Van Bortel Aircraft Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Kenneth)
October 25, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DEFENDANT KELLY AEROSPACE THERMAL SYSTEMS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Kelly Aerospace Thermal Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(O'Daniel, David)
October 25, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Chandler Aviation Services Incorporated. (Kiser, James)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Defendant Kelly Aerospace Thermal Systems, LLC to file its Answer or other responsive pleading shall be extended to and including October 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 10/24/2019. (TCA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #44 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lynn Spanganberg, Peter Spanganberg, Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC, LNS Enterprises LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
October 22, 2019 Filing 47 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT KELLY AEROSPACE THERMAL SYSTEMS, LLC TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Kelly Aerospace Thermal Systems LLC. (O'Daniel, David)
October 22, 2019 Filing 46 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Textron Aviation Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Textron Incorporated for Textron Aviation Incorporated. (Pugel, Rachael) *Modified/corrected corporate party per party name standards on 10/23/2019 (EJA).
October 21, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Lone Mountain Aviation Incorporated. (Moskow, Kenneth)
October 21, 2019 Filing 44 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LNS Enterprises LLC, Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC. (Lawler, Brian) *Modified to remove filers on 10/23/2019 (EJA).
October 18, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC, Lynn Spanganberg, Peter Spanganberg. (Lewis, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Tracy H Fowler on behalf of Defendant Textron Aviation Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 18, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Leading Edge Aviation Incorporated. (Greer, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Falcon Executive Aviation Incorporated. (Marburger, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. (Skinner, Will)
October 17, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Continental Motors Group Limited. (Skinner, Will)
October 17, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Continental Motors Incorporated. (Skinner, Will)
October 16, 2019 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chandler Aviation Services Incorporated. (Kiser, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #34 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lynn Spanganberg, Peter Spanganberg, Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC, LNS Enterprises LLC, #33 Response to Motion filed by Lynn Spanganberg, Peter Spanganberg, Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC, LNS Enterprises LLC, #35 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Lynn Spanganberg, Peter Spanganberg, Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC, LNS Enterprises LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
October 16, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for James S Kiser on behalf of Defendant Chandler Aviation Services Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 15, 2019 Filing 35 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LNS Enterprises LLC, Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC, Lynn Spanganberg, Peter Spanganberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian J. Lawler, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Brian J. Lawler, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Brian J. Lawler, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Brian J. Lawler)(Lawler, Brian) *Modified to correct event on 10/16/2019 (REK).
October 15, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LNS Enterprises LLC, Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC, Lynn Spanganberg, Peter Spanganberg. (Lawler, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Filing 33 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LNS Enterprises LLC, Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC, Lynn Spanganberg, Peter Spanganberg. (Lawler, Brian) *Modified text on 10/16/2019 (REK).
October 15, 2019 Filing 32 Joinder re: #27 Response in Opposition to Motion Specially Appearing Defendant Textron Aviation Inc.'s Joinder in Specially Appearing Defendants Continental Motors, Inc., Continental Motors Group Limited, and Teledyne Technologies Incorporated's Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses and Replies to Motions to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Motion for Order That no Discovery be Conducted by Defendant Textron Aviation Incorporated. filed by Textron Aviation Incorporated. (Pugel, Rachael)
October 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Zachary Joseph Ballard on behalf of Defendant Van Bortel Aircraft Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 13, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Van Bortel Aircraft Incorporated. (Reynolds, Kenneth)
October 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #29 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC, LNS Enterprises LLC, #24 Response to Motion filed by Falcon Executive Aviation Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
October 10, 2019 Filing 29 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LNS Enterprises LLC, Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC. (Lawler, Brian) *Modified to correct filers and document links on 10/11/2019 (REK).
October 10, 2019 Filing 28 Joinder re: #27 Response in Opposition to Motion by Defendant Leading Edge Aviation Incorporated. filed by Leading Edge Aviation Incorporated. (Greer, Robert)
October 10, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #15 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Continental Motors Group Limited, Continental Motors Incorporated, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. (Fischer, C)
October 10, 2019 Filing 26 Joinder re: #24 Response to Motion by Defendant Chandler Aviation Services Incorporated. (Moolenaar, Peter)
October 10, 2019 Filing 25 *Joinder re: #24 Response to Motion re: #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Lone Mountain Aviation Incorporated. (Moskow, Kenneth) *Modified to correct document link and text on 10/11/2019 (REK).
October 10, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re: #22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #15 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Falcon Executive Aviation Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marburger, James)
October 9, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Professional Air. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Glady, Edward)
October 9, 2019 Filing 22 *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION for an Order that no Discovery be Conducted by LNS Enterprises LLC, Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC, Lynn Spanganberg, Peter Spanganberg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order to continue)(Lewis, Robert). *Added MOTION to Stay on 10/10/2019 (REK).
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lone Mountain Aviation Incorporated. (Moskow, Kenneth)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Falcon Executive Aviation Incorporated. (Marburger, James)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cessna Aircraft Company, Textron Aviation Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pugel, Rachael)
October 3, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brian J Lawler on behalf of Plaintiffs LNS Enterprises LLC, Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC, Lynn Spanganberg, and Peter Spanganberg. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 3, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Will S Skinner and Erik Slechta on behalf of Defendants Aviation Industry Corporation of China, Continental Motors Group Limited, Continental Motors Incorporated, and Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leading Edge Aviation Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record Certificate of Service)(Greer, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT VERIFICATION IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Aviation Industry Corporation of China. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5-13)(Fischer, C)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Leading Edge Aviation Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Greer, Robert)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 *MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Professional Air. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Gwil Evans)(Glady, Edward) *Modified to remove motion to dismiss on 10/1/2019 (REK).
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 *MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Van Bortel Aircraft Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Kenneth) *Modified to correct motion type on 10/16/2019 (REK).
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Melanie Cibik)(Fischer, C)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Continental Motors Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Ward)(Fischer, C)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Continental Motors Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Ward)(Fischer, C)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that this matter be reassigned, by random lot, to another judge in the District of Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-19-05221-PHX-SMB. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/20/2019. (REK)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to LNS Enterprises LLC. (KEP)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Aviation Industry Corporation of China. Amendment to 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only), #1 Notice of Removal CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Fischer, C)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Aviation Industry Corporation of China. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Aviation Industry Corporation of China. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17420635. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5221-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aviation Industry Corporation of China. (Fischer, C.)(KEP)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-011156. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17420635 filed by Aviation Industry Corporation of China. (Fischer, C.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LNS Enterprises LLC et al v. Continental Motors Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonoma Oral and Facial Surgery PLLC
Represented By: Robert Kenneth Lewis
Represented By: Amy Marie Pokora
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Treadway
Represented By: Brian J Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Spanganberg
Represented By: Robert Kenneth Lewis
Represented By: Amy Marie Pokora
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Treadway
Represented By: Brian J Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LNS Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Robert Kenneth Lewis
Represented By: Amy Marie Pokora
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Treadway
Represented By: Brian J Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Spanganberg
Represented By: Robert Kenneth Lewis
Represented By: Amy Marie Pokora
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Treadway
Represented By: Brian J Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Air
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Motors Group Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Executive Aviation Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Bortel Aircraft Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandler Aviation Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Mountain Aviation Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Aerospace Thermal Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cessna Aircraft Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skylancer Aviation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Aircraft Manufacturing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teledyne Technologies Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leading Edge Aviation Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviation Industry Corporation of China
Represented By: Will S Skinner
Represented By: Erik D Slechta
Represented By: C Megan Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Motors Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?