Green v. Adeptus Health Management LLC
Plaintiff: Kimberly Green
Defendant: Adeptus Health Management LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05228
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 12/19/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/15/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Adeptus Health Management LLC.(Downey, Mark)
September 25, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Mark David Downey on behalf of Defendant Adeptus Health Management LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/23/2019. (LFIG)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Adeptus Health Management LLC. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17422520. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-05228-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Kimberly Green. (Knoller, Guy) (BAC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17422520 filed by Kimberly Green. (Knoller, Guy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-3)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Adeptus Health Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adeptus Health Management LLC
Represented By: Mark David Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Green
Represented By: Guy David Knoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?