Radix Law PLC v. Mullen
Plaintiff: Radix Law PLC
Defendant: Brian Mullen
Trustee: United States Trustees Office
Debtor: My Vintage Venue LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05248
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF by Radix Law PLC. (Tatkin, Carolyn)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #16 Brief - Bankruptcy Response filed by Brian Mullen. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE BRIEF by Brian Mullen. (Nach, Adam)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 OPENING BRIEF by Radix Law PLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Excerpts of Record)(Tatkin, Carolyn)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: The appellant shall serve and file an opening brief with the Clerk within fourteen (14) days of the date this order is filed (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/4/2019. (MMO)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Stay. The United States Bankruptcy Court's September 16, 2019 Order Ruling on (1) Trustee's Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Radix Law, PLC; (2) Trustee's Final Report and Radix's Objection Thereto; and (3) Trustee's Motion for Payment of Attorneys Fees and Costs as Amended by the Court is STAYED pending appeal. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/3/2019. (MMO)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #2 Emergency MOTION to Stay - Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8007 (Expedited Consideration Requested) filed by Radix Law PLC. (Tatkin, Carolyn)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Brian Mullen. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 Emergency MOTION to Stay - Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8007 (Expedited Consideration Requested) filed by Brian Mullen. (Nach, Adam)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Radix Law PLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMV)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the United States Bankruptcy Court's September 16, 2019 Order Ruling on (1) Trustee's Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Radix Law, PLC; (2) Trustee's Final Report and Radixs Objection Thereto; and (3) Trustee's Motion for Payment of Attorneys Fees and Costs as Amended by the Court is temporarily stayed until October 7, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by no later than September 30, 2019, Appellee submit his Response to Plaintiffs Motion. Appellant may file a Reply, if any, no later than October 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/24/19. (MSA)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Radix Law PLC. (Tatkin, Carolyn) *Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3). Attorney noticed on 9/25/2019 (RMV).
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Radix Law PLC. (MSA)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (MSA)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #2 Emergency MOTION to Stay - Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8007 (Expedited Consideration Requested) - Appendix to Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8007 by Plaintiff Radix Law PLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3, #4 Appendix 4, #5 Appendix 5, #6 Appendix 6, #7 Appendix 7, #8 Appendix 8, #9 Appendix 9, #10 Appendix 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Appendix 12)(Tatkin, Carolyn)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION to Stay - Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8007 (Expedited Consideration Requested) by Radix Law PLC. (Tatkin, Carolyn)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court by Radix Law PLC. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radix Law PLC v. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mullen
Represented By: Adam Bennett Nach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radix Law PLC
Represented By: Jonathan B Frutkin
Represented By: Carolyn R Tatkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustees Office
Represented By: Edward Kenneth Bernatavicius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: My Vintage Venue LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?