Intex Recreation Corporation v. Bestway (USA) Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Intex Recreation Corporation
Defendant: Bestway Inflatables & Materials Corporation, Bestway (USA) Incorporated, Bestway Global Holding Incorporated and Bestway (Hong Kong) International Limited
Case Number: 2:2019cv05335
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #10 ), Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Intex Recreation Corporation. (Burgeson, Wade)
October 29, 2019 Remark: Out of state attorney Reid Dodge removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 8, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for R Trevor Carter, Andrew M McCoy on behalf of Plaintiff Intex Recreation Corporation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint, 8 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Intex Recreation Corporation. (Burgeson, Wade)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Intex Recreation Corporation. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile the Civil Cover Sheet, using the correct format. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Intex Recreation Corporation. (BAC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 *NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Intex Recreation Corporation. (BAC) *Modified to reflect corrected document filed at Doc. #7 on 10/7/2019 (SCH).
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121 form)(BAC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17484467. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-05335-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intex Recreation Corporation. (Burgeson, Wade) (BAC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17484467 filed by Intex Recreation Corporation. (Burgeson, Wade) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Exhibits to Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intex Recreation Corporation v. Bestway (USA) Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestway Inflatables & Materials Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestway (USA) Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestway Global Holding Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestway (Hong Kong) International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intex Recreation Corporation
Represented By: Reid E Dodge
Represented By: R Trevor Carter
Represented By: Wade Michael Burgeson
Represented By: Andrew M McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?