Decor Team LLC et al v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Shai Avisira and Decor Team LLC
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kathy Baran and Donald Neufeld
Case Number: 2:2019cv05346
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Shai Avisira, Decor Team LLC. (Joseph, Jeffrey)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shai Avisira, Decor Team LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon U.S. Attorney on 10/15/2019, Donald Neufeld on 10/11/2019, Kathy Baran on 10/15/2019, Kenneth Cuccinelli on 10/11/2019, Kevin McAleenan on 10/11/2019, and U.S. Attorney General on 10/11/2019. (Joseph, Jeffrey) *Modified text to include appropriate service information on 10/17/2019 (RMV).
October 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jeffrey Dean Joseph on behalf of Plaintiffs Shai Avisira and Decor Team LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kathy Baran, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K McAleenan, Donald Neufeld, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17496097. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5346-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Shai Avisira, Decor Team LLC. (Joseph, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(MCO)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Decor Team LLC. (Joseph, Jeffrey) (MCO)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17496097 filed by Decor Team LLC, Shai Avisira. (Joseph, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decor Team LLC et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shai Avisira
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Decor Team LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?