Singh v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Princepal Singh
Respondent: Enrique Lucero, James McHenry, John Davis, William Barr and Kevin K McAleenan
Case Number: 2:2019cv05359
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett (PS)
Referring Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Remark: 1 CD - as outlined in the Respondents Notice re: Filing Non-Electronic Exhibits 6a and 6b as to Respondents Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #15 has been received, and will be stored in the Phoenix file room. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (HLA)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE re: Filing Exhibit Non-Electronically by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Kevin K McAleenan re: #12 Order on Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Non-Electronically. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Filed Non-Electronically)(Branch, Katherine)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Kevin K McAleenan. (Branch, Katherine)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Kevin K McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Branch, Katherine)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Non-Electronically. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/19/2019. (RMV)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Non-Electronically by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Kevin K McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Branch, Katherine)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS by Marshall G Whitehead. (Whitehead, Marshall)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: petition, order, motion, summons upon U.S. Attorney General on 10/17/19. (SLQ)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: petition, motion, summons upon U.S. Attorney, District of Arizona on 10/16/19. (SLQ)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: petition, motion, summons upon Enrique Lucero on 10/15/19. (SLQ)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: A temporary stay of removal is granted. Respondents are enjoined from removing Petitioner Princepal Singh (A# 201-741-759) from the United States pending further order of this Court. Petitioner's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order is denied in part as to Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Respondents McHenry and Davis are dismissed without prejudice. Respondents Barr, McAleenan, and Lucero shall have 30 days from the date of service to file a Response to Petitioner's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Petitioner shall have 15 days from the filing of Respondents' Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction to file a Reply. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/11/19. (GMP)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MCO)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Princepal Singh. (Whitehead, Marshall) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MCO)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Princepal Singh. (Whitehead, Marshall) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(MCO)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-17503126 filed by Princepal Singh. (Whitehead, Marshall) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Enrique Lucero
Represented By: Katherine R Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Katherine R Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: Katherine R Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Princepal Singh
Represented By: Marshall G Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?