Skvarek et al v. Home Depot USA Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Frank Skvarek and Tracy Skvarek
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Home Depot USA Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv05374
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Dispositive motions due by 7/1/2020 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/19/19. (MAW)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' joint Rule 26(f) report (Doc. #7 ), concludes it is unnecessary to hold a Rule 16 Case Management Conference. Accordingly, the Rule 16 Case Management Conference set on November 25, 2019, is vacated. The Court will separately issue the Case Management Order. Counsel are to note at Item 11 of the Case Management Order that the deadlines are real, and the Court will enforce the deadlines set forth in the Order. The parties should plan their litigation activities accordingly. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/19/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) - JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN filed by Plaintiffs Frank Skvarek, Tracy Skvarek. (Feder, Bruce)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for November 25, 2019, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 601, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/15/19. (MAW)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17508645. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5374-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
October 11, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** ANSWER to Complaint by Home Depot USA Incorporated. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 10/3/2019) ***ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES***(ARC)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot USA Incorporated. (Collins, Jefferson) (ARC)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-012487. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17508645 filed by Home Depot USA Incorporated. (Collins, Jefferson) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skvarek et al v. Home Depot USA Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Incorporated
Represented By: Jefferson T Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Skvarek
Represented By: Bruce S Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Skvarek
Represented By: Bruce S Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?