Reish v. Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated Liquidation Trust et al
Plaintiff: Robert Reish and Robert C Reish
Defendant: Phoenix Heliparts Liquidation Trust and Louie Mukai
Debtor: Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated
Counter Defendant: Kathleen Reish
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated Liquidation Trust
3Rd Party Defendant: Ryuko Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv05387
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Appellants motion (Doc. #8 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to dismiss this case. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/14/19. (SLQ)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case re: motion to withdraw reference by Kathleen Reish, Robert C Reish, Robert C Reish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Horner, H)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court filed by Louie Mukai, Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated Liquidation Trust. (Cross, James)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Louie Mukai, Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated Liquidation Trust. (Cross, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kathleen Reish, Robert C Reish, Robert C Reish. (Horner, H)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated Liquidation Trust, Ryuko Incorporated. (REK)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Matter. (REK)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reish v. Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated Liquidation Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Heliparts Liquidation Trust
Represented By: James E Cross
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louie Mukai
Represented By: James E Cross
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reish
Represented By: Paul L Cass
Represented By: H Lee Horner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Reish
Represented By: H Lee Horner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Kathleen Reish
Represented By: H Lee Horner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated Liquidation Trust
Represented By: James E Cross
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ryuko Incorporated
Represented By: H Lee Horner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?