Cummings et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Plaintiff: Rosemary McClelland, Denae Lossing, Shoshana Korrub, Todd MacGowan, Joaquin Zendejas, Robert Cummings, Heidi Schultz, Brandon Edwards, Kevin Connor and Kari Golden
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv05587
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDE ORDER: This matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. All pending hearings and deadlines are vacated. All pending motions are found to be moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on January 21, 2020 without further leave of Court. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/20/2019. (REK)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 *Amended by #13 *ORDER: This matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. All pending hearings and deadlines are vacated. All pending motions are found to be moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on January 13, 2020 without further leave of Court. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/20/2019. (REK) Modified on 12/20/2019 (REK).
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Zapata-Rossa, Marian)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties' stipulation to dismiss #8 is granted. Plaintiffs Brandon Edwards, Kari Golden, Shoshana Korrub, and Joaquin Zendejas are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants' stipulation for extension of time to file an answer to the complaint is denied. Defendant's filed a previous motion for extension of time #5 requesting an extension to December 2, 2019 to file their answer to the complaint, which was granted by the Court on November 20, 2019 7 . In its Order 7 , the court ordered that no further extensions would be granted for Defendant to file its answer to the complaint in this matter. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/03/2019. (REK)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/3/2019. (DGC, nvo)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.(Zapata-Rossa, Marian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal and for Extension to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Joint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zapata-Rossa, Marian)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/20/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/20/2019. (DGC, nvo)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zapata-Rossa, Marian)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17612350. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5587-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
November 7, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement, Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery to Defendants, Disc with Initial Disclosure Statement upon JP Morgan Chase Bank NA c/o Corporation Systems on 10/7/2019. (Original filed in state court - Maricopa County Superior Court on 10/14/2019) (DLC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Zapata-Rossa, Marian) (DLC)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-009094. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17612350 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Zapata-Rossa, Marian) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration of Marian Zapata-Rossa, #4 Exhibit)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummings et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary McClelland
Represented By: Phil Scott Flemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denae Lossing
Represented By: Phil Scott Flemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoshana Korrub
Represented By: Phil Scott Flemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd MacGowan
Represented By: Phil Scott Flemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Zendejas
Represented By: Phil Scott Flemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cummings
Represented By: Phil Scott Flemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Schultz
Represented By: Phil Scott Flemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Edwards
Represented By: Phil Scott Flemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Connor
Represented By: Phil Scott Flemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Golden
Represented By: Phil Scott Flemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Marian M Zapata-Rossa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?