Arlington Valley Solar Energy II LLC v. Fluor Enterprises Incorporated
Plaintiff: Arlington Valley Solar Energy II LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Fluor Enterprises Incorporated
3Rd Party Defendant: Advanced Energy Industries Incorporated and Advanced Energy Industries Incorporated doing business as AE Solar Energy Incorporated now known as Bold Renewables Holdings LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05595
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael J Baker on behalf of Defendant Fluor Enterprises Incorporated, ThirdParty Plaintiff Fluor Enterprises Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 19, 2019 Filing 21 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Advanced Energy Industries Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 11/15/19 to William J. Serritella, Jr. . (Erickson, Richard) *Modified to correct waiver date on 12/19/2019 (SLQ).
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Arlington Valley Solar Energy II LLC. (Burns, William)
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Fluor Enterprises Incorporated, ThirdParty Plaintiff Fluor Enterprises Incorporated. (Erickson, Richard)
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arlington Valley Solar Energy II LLC identifying Corporate Parent AVSE II Holdings, LLC for Arlington Valley Solar Energy II LLC. (Burns, William)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Energy Industries Incorporated identifying Bold Renewable Holdings LLC, Bold Renewables LLC and Sakonnet Holdings I LLC as corporate parties. (Serritella, William) *Modified to add corporate parties on 12/11/2019 (EJA).
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Heitz Vella on behalf of Advanced Energy Industries Incorporated. (Vella, Theresa)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ioana Maria Guset on behalf of Advanced Energy Industries Incorporated. (Guset, Ioana)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Serritella, Jr on behalf of Advanced Energy Industries Incorporated. (Serritella, William)
December 4, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for William J Serritella, Jr, and Ioana Maria Guset on behalf of ThirdParty Defendant Advanced Energy Industries Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 3, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Craig Joseph Ledet and William Robert Burns on behalf of Plaintiff Arlington Valley Solar Energy II LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 3, 2019 Remark: Out of state attorney Whitney Dupree removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Advanced Energy Industries Incorporated. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Fluor Enterprises Incorporated. (Erickson, Richard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Advanced Energy Industries Incorporated by Fluor Enterprises Incorporated.(Erickson, Richard)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/12/2019. (MMO)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/12/2019. (MMO)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Enterprises Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Fluor Corporation for Fluor Enterprises Incorporated. (Erickson, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 6 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) by Defendant Fluor Enterprises Incorporated. (Erickson, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Fluor Enterprises Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Arlington Valley Solar Energy II LLC. (ARC)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Fluor Enterprises Incorporated. (ARC)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17615878. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5595-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-010623. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17615878 filed by Fluor Enterprises Incorporated. (Erickson, Richard) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1-5, #4 Exhibit 6-11, #5 Exhibit 12-1, #6 Exhibit 12-2, #7 Exhibit 12-3, #8 Exhibit 12-4, #9 Exhibit 12-5, #10 Declaration)(ARC)
November 8, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Fluor Enterprises Incorporated on 10/10/2019. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 10/10/2019) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. Modified to correct docket text on 11/8/2019 (ARC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arlington Valley Solar Energy II LLC v. Fluor Enterprises Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlington Valley Solar Energy II LLC
Represented By: Whitney Dupree
Represented By: William R Burns
Represented By: Craig J Ledet
Represented By: Craig Joseph Ledet
Represented By: William Robert Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Fluor Enterprises Incorporated
Represented By: Richard Gray Erickson
Represented By: Amanda Zoe Weaver
Represented By: Michael J Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Advanced Energy Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Theresa Heitz Vella
Represented By: William J Serritella, Jr.
Represented By: Ioana Maria Guset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Advanced Energy Industries Incorporated doing business as AE Solar Energy Incorporated now known as Bold Renewables Holdings LLC
Represented By: Theresa Heitz Vella
Represented By: William J Serritella, Jr.
Represented By: Ioana Maria Guset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?