Burke v. Shinn et al
Petitioner: Robert James Burke
Respondent: David Shinn and Mark Brnovich
Case Number: 2:2019cv05627
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett (PS)
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
2 Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting the Motion for Extension of Time #9 . Respondents shall file their response to Petitioner's Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus By A Person in State Custody #1 no later than February 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/07/20. (REK)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) by Mark Brnovich, David Shinn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Francis, Jillian)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Respondents' Answer shall not exceed thirty pages without prior leave of the Court. The portions of the state court record submitted with Respondents' Answer shall not count towards the page limit. Petitioner may file a reply within thirty days from the date the Answer is served. The Reply shall not exceed fifteen pages without prior leave of the Court. Neither party shall file a document that contains more than one motion. Neither party shall file a response or reply that pertains to more than one motion. A document that fails to comply with the requirements herein may be stricken by the Court. See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 12/20/2019. (REK)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian Brittany Francis on behalf of Mark Brnovich, David Shinn. (Francis, Jillian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Receipt of Electronic Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arizona Attorney General on 11/27/19. The Attorney General's Office will file a Notice of Appearance within five (5) business days that identifies the respondents that are represented or, in the alternative, will notify the Court if the Attorney General is not able to accept service for and/or represent any of the named respondents. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Nielsen, Jim)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Arizona Attorney General Service Order (2254): The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Petition (Doc. #1 ) and this Order on the Respondent(s) and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by electronic mail. Respondents must answer the Petition within 40 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition (2254), #2 Index, #3 Memorandum, #4 Affidavit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMV)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) Civil Cover Sheet by Petitioner Robert James Burke. (Denea, Michael)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Robert James Burke. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (KEP)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-17630724 filed by Robert James Burke. (Denea, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Memorandum, #3 Affidavit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Shinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Shinn
Represented By: Jillian Brittany Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Jillian Brittany Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert James Burke
Represented By: Michael Philip Denea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?