Sobarzo et al v. Wal-Mart Incorporated
Plaintiff: John Keck and Claudia M Sobarzo
Defendant: Wal-Mart Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv05662
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Incorporated to plaintiffs at counter. (BAS) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Incorporated filed by Claudia M Sobarzo, John Keck(document is unsigned).(GMP)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #2 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and shall file proof of service no later than February 19, 2020. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/26/19. (SLQ)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (WLP)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (WLP)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-05662-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (WLP)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John Keck, Claudia M Sobarzo. (WLP)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Claudia M Sobarzo, John Keck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(WLP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sobarzo et al v. Wal-Mart Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia M Sobarzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?