Corbin v. Arizona City Fire District et al
Plaintiff: Hazel Corbin
Defendant: Arizona City Fire District, Unknown Heaton and Jeff Heaton
Case Number: 2:2019cv05716
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 *NOTICE re: Service Preliminary Order Doc 7 and 7-1 filed by Hazel Corbin. (Nowakowski, David) *Modified to correct event on 1/17/2020 (DXD).
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 2/18/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Hazel Corbin: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons and Documents 3 and 4 upon Jane Doe Heaton on 12/17/19. (Nowakowski, David)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Hazel Corbin: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons and Documents 3 and 4 upon Jeff Heaton on 12/17/19. (Nowakowski, David)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Hazel Corbin: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons and Documents 3 and 4 upon Arizona City Fire District on 12/17/19. (Nowakowski, David)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Arizona City Fire District, Jeff Heaton, Unknown Heaton.(Matura, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on March 2, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Arizona City Fire District, Jeff Heaton, Unknown Heaton. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Hazel Corbin. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17689005. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5716-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Hazel Corbin. (Nowakowski, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17689005 filed by Hazel Corbin. (Nowakowski, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbin v. Arizona City Fire District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona City Fire District
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Matura
Represented By: Melanie Marie Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heaton
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Matura
Represented By: Melanie Marie Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Heaton
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Matura
Represented By: Melanie Marie Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Corbin
Represented By: David Alan Nowakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?