Fort et al v. Riverside County Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Taisha Nunga, Garland Fort, Michele Fort and Joseph Charles
Defendant: Michael Walsh, Carrie Harmon and Riverside County Housing Authority
Case Number: 2:2019cv05847
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for an extension of time (Doc. #22 ) is DENIED. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate any remaining pending motions and close this case. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/20/20. (SLQ)
May 18, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint (Due on 5/18/20, Requesting 90 Day Extension up to Including 8/18/20). by Joseph Charles, Garland Fort, Michele Fort. (1 Page) (MAP)
March 5, 2020 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michele Fort. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. Document numbers 8, 9, and 10. (REK)
March 2, 2020 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michele Fort. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. Document number 11. (REK)
March 2, 2020 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michele Fort. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. Document number 18. (REK)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint Due on 2-18-20 Requesting 90 Days Extension up Until 5-18-2020 to File Amended Complaint. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file an Amended Complaint is extended through and including 5/18/2020. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/19/2020. (MMO)
February 18, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint by Joseph Charles, Garland Fort, Michele Fort, Taisha Nunga. (2 pages) (REK)
February 3, 2020 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Joseph Charles. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. Document number 11. (REK)
January 27, 2020 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Joseph Charles. Reason for return: moved, left no address. Document number #8 , #9 and #10 . (EJA)
January 27, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joseph Charles. (EJA)
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Joseph Charles. (EJA)
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Joseph Charles. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (EJA)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiffs Garland Fort, Michele Fort, and Taisha Nunga's #2 , #3 Applications for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Plaintiff Joseph Charles wishes to proceed in forma pauperis, he must file his own application. Plaintiffs' complaint (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the reasons stated herein. Plaintiffs may, if they so choose, file an amended complaint by no later than 2/18/2020. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this case without further order of the Court if Plaintiffs do not file an amended complaint within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/24/2020. (MMO) Pursuant to Docs. 12 and 16, NEF regenerated to Joseph Charles only on 2/4/2020 (NKS).
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (HLA)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (HLA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5847-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (HLA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Taisha Nunga. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (HLA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Garland Fort. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (HLA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Garland Fort. (HLA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Taisha Nunga. (HLA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Taisha Nunga. (HLA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Garland Fort, Michele Fort. (HLA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Taisha Nunga, Garland Fort, Joseph Charles, Michele Fort.(HLA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fort et al v. Riverside County Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taisha Nunga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garland Fort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Fort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside County Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?