Ulrich v. Sominsky et al
Defendant: Leonard V. Sominsky, ESQ., P.C.
Appellee: Marina G. Sominsky, Leonard V. Sominsky, Marina G Sominsky, Leonard V Sominsky and Leonard V Sominsky Esq. PC
Appellant: Dale D Ulrich
Debtor: Michael H Alchuiliti
Case Number: 2:2020cv00017
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' First Stipulated Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule (Doc. #10 ). Appellant shall file and serve his opening brief on or before March 12, 2020; Appellees shall file and serve a responsive brief on or before April 15, 2020; and Appellant shall file and serve a reply brief on or before April 30, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/24/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 *First MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Briefing Schedule (Renewed) by Dale D Ulrich. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Oder Approving (Renewed) First Stipulated Moton to Extend Briefing Schedule)(Goldberg, Scott) *Modified to remove Ex-Parte designation on 2/24/2020 (EJA).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On Appellant's opening brief due date (Doc. #7 ), the parties to this Bankruptcy Appeal filed a "First Stipulated Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule" (Doc. #8 ). The Motion fails to show good cause for the lengthy extensions that are requested therein. Accordingly, the Motion (Doc. #8 ) is DENIED without prejudice. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/11/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 *First MOTION for Extension of Time Extending Briefing Schedule (Stipulated) by Dale D Ulrich. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving First Stipulated Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule)(Goldberg, Scott) *Modified to remove ex parte designation on 2/11/2020 (GMP).
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that appellant shall serve and file an opening brief within 14 days after the date this order is filed. The appellee shall serve and file a responsive brief within 14 days after service of the appellant's brief; and the appellant may serve and file a reply within 14 days after service of the appellee's brief. ORDERED that if this matter is stayed pending related proceedings, a written joint status report shall be due every six (6) months from date of the order staying the case. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/27/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leonard V Sominsky Esq. PC. (O'Daniel, David) *Modified to correct filer on 1/21/2020 (REK).
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dale D Ulrich. (Goldberg, Scott)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Leonard V Sominsky Esq. PC. (REK)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulrich v. Sominsky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard V. Sominsky, ESQ., P.C.
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Represented By: Annelise Mari Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Marina G. Sominsky
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Represented By: Annelise Mari Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Leonard V. Sominsky
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Represented By: Annelise Mari Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Marina G Sominsky
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Represented By: Annelise Mari Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Leonard V Sominsky
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Represented By: Annelise Mari Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Leonard V Sominsky Esq. PC
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Represented By: Annelise Mari Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dale D Ulrich
Represented By: Scott Robert Goldberg
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Michael H Alchuiliti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?