BBK Tobacco & Foods LLP v. US Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: BBK Tobacco & Foods LLP and BBK Tobacco & Foods LLP doing business as HBI International
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 2:2020cv00053
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Errata re: #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant US Department of Health and Human Services.. (Staes, William)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's unopposed motion seeking additional time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (ECF No. #12 ) is granted. Accordingly, Defendant shall have until March 16, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 3/3/20. (SLQ)
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by US Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Staes, William)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to US Department of Health and Human Services. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by BBK Tobacco & Foods LLP. (Long, Frank)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BBK Tobacco & Foods LLP. (Long, Frank)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by BBK Tobacco & Foods LLP. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to BBK Tobacco & Foods LLP. (MCO)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to US Department of Health and Human Services. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17811692. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-0053-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by BBK Tobacco & Foods LLP. (Long, Frank) (MCO)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF - Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17811692 filed by BBK Tobacco & Foods LLP. (Long, Frank) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BBK Tobacco & Foods LLP v. US Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBK Tobacco & Foods LLP
Represented By: Frank Garrett Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBK Tobacco & Foods LLP doing business as HBI International
Represented By: Frank Garrett Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: William Charles Staes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?