Singh v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Ranvir Singh
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Enrique Lucero, James McHenry, William Barr and Paul Habich
Case Number: 2:2020cv00193
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Referring Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed February 20, 2020, judgment of dismissal is entered, and this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (MSA)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - The parties' #12 Stipulation to Dismiss is granted. Petitioner's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this action are dismissed with prejudice in their entirety. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Petitioner's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied as moot. The #5 temporary stay of removal entered on January 31, 2020 is lifted. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and terminate this case. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/20/2020. (MSA)
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrison, Kristina)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Complaint/Order upon William Barr on 2/11/2020. (MSA)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Order upon US Attorney District of Arizona, ATTN CV Processing Clerk, on 2/7/2020. (LAD)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Order upon Enrique Lucero on 2/4/2020. (LAD)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kristina L. Morrison appearing for William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Chad Wolf. . (Morrison, Kristina)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney, District of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MSA)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - A temporary stay of removal is granted. Respondents are enjoined from removing Petitioner Ranvir Singh (A# 203-713-962) from the United States pending further order of this Court. Petitioner's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order is denied in part as to Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Respondents McHenry and Habich are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall serve: (1) a copy of the Summons, (2) the #1 Petition, the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order, and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court shall also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order, and this Order to the United States Attorney General pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(B) and to Respondents Barr, Wolf, and Lucero pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Petitioner must file a "Notice of Custody Status" with the Clerk of Court within 5 days of any material change in Petitioner's custody status. Petitioner may not include a motion for other relief with the Notice. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/31/2020. (MSA)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (ARC)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Ranvir Singh. (Anleu, Jessica) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ARC)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ranvir Singh. (Anleu, Jessica) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ARC)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-17876885 filed by Ranvir Singh. (Anleu, Jessica) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Enrique Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Habich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ranvir Singh
Represented By: Jessica Anne Anleu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?