Singh v. Barr et al
Defendant: Enrique Lucero, Chad Wolf, William Barr, Jennifer Gaz and James McHenry
Petitioner: Gurpreet Singh
Case Number: 2:2020cv00194
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett (PS)
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Order upon Attorney General William Barr on 2/3/2020. (WLP)
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Order upon Enrique Lucero on 1/31/2020. Pursuant to the USPS website, the delivery date was 1/31/2020. (WLP)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, pursuant to the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal, that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (LAD)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation of Dismissal to dismiss this case with prejudice. The Clerk of Court must enter Judgment of Dismissal with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/6/2020. (LAD)
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Order upon U.S. Attorney for the District of Arizona (attn: Civil Process Clerk) on 2/3/2020. (WLP)
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Notice of Mootness by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sichi, Elizabeth)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Chad Wolf, US Attorney District of Arizona, ATTN: CV Process Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(LAD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: (1) The Clerk of Court must send a copy of this order by separate email to the Immigration TRO Group. The Clerk of Court must also send a copy of this order by separate email to Petitioner's counsel, Jessica Anleu, jal@ficpcaz.com (2) A temporary stay of removal is granted. Respondents are enjoined from removing Petitioner Gurpreet Singh (A# 203-713-989) from the United States pending further order of this Court. (3) Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #2 ) is denied in part as to Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.(4) Respondents McHenry and Gaz are dismissed without prejudice. (5) The Clerk of Court shall provide service as set forth in the Order. Respondents Barr, Wolf, and Lucero shall have 30 days from the date of service to file a Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ). Petitioner shall have 15 days from the filing of Respondents' Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction to file a Reply. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of service to answer the Petition (Doc. #1 ). Respondents shall not file a dispositive motion in place of an answer absent leave of Court. Petitioner shall have 15 days from the filing of Respondents' Answer to the Petition to file a Reply. Petitioner must file a Notice of Custody Status with the Clerk of Court within 5 days of any material change in Petitioner's custody status. Petitioner may not include a motion for other relief with the Notice. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/28/20. (SJF)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Kay Sichi on behalf of William Barr, Jennifer Gaz, Enrique Lucero, James McHenry, Chad Wolf. (Sichi, Elizabeth)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Gurpreet Singh. (Anleu, Jessica) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(BAC)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Gurpreet Singh. (Anleu, Jessica) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A TRO, #3 Exhibit B TRO)(BAC)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $5.00, receipt number 0970-17882908 filed by Gurpreet Singh. (Anleu, Jessica) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Lucero
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Gaz
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McHenry
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gurpreet Singh
Represented By: Jessica Anne Anleu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?