Fuciarelli et al v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: K.A. Fuciarelli, The Fuciarelli Group, LLC, Fuciarelli Group LLC and KA Fuciarelli
Defendant: Richard Paul Brown and Belinda Gail Brown
Case Number: 2:2020cv00279
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 STATEMENT of Interest of the United States re: #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by Interested Party United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Healy, Christopher) *Modified linkage on 3/18/2020 (DXD).
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Second Notice by the United States Concerning Further Participation in Proceedings Before This Court by United States of America . (Gomez, Raphael)
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Richard Paul Brown, Belinda Gail Brown. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
March 3, 2020 Filing 10 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court filed by Belinda Gail Brown, Richard Paul Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration)(Barski, Christopher) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation on 3/4/2020 (SST).
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Concerning Further Participation in Proceedings Before This Court by United States of America . (Healy, Christopher)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE filed by KA Fuciarelli, Fuciarelli Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5 - STATE COURT COMPENDIUM, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 6 - ADVERSARY ACTION COMPENDIUM)(Christian, James)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation (Doc. #6 ) is granted. Plaintiffs have up to and including February 26, 2020 to file a response to the Motion to Withdraw Reference. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/14/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION re: #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW by KA Fuciarelli, Fuciarelli Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Christian, James)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fuciarelli Group LLC. (Christian, James) *Modified to remove filer on 2/18/2020 (DXD).
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Fuciarelli Group LLC. (DXD)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Matter. (DXD)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuciarelli et al v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Paul Brown
Represented By: Christopher David Barski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Gail Brown
Represented By: Christopher David Barski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.A. Fuciarelli
Represented By: James St Pierre Christian
Represented By: Richard Glenn Himelrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fuciarelli Group, LLC
Represented By: James St Pierre Christian
Represented By: Richard Glenn Himelrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuciarelli Group LLC
Represented By: James St Pierre Christian
Represented By: Richard Glenn Himelrick
Represented By: Christopher Reed Kaup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KA Fuciarelli
Represented By: James St Pierre Christian
Represented By: Richard Glenn Himelrick
Represented By: Christopher Reed Kaup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?