Tanita Produce Company Incorporated et al v. Bella Fresh Phoenix LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tanita Produce Company Incorporated, Monterey Mushrooms Incorporated and CF Fresh LLC
Defendant: Daniel Rodriguez, Lawrence Ruggiero, Bella Fresh Phoenix LLC, Bella Fresh Houston LLC and Bella Fresh LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00295
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan, United States District Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-20- 00295-PHX-SPL. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 3/23/2020. (WLP)
March 23, 2020 Filing 15 Defendant Lawrence Ruggiero's ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Lawrence Ruggiero.(Goodwin, Nicole)
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by CF Fresh LLC, Monterey Mushrooms Incorporated, Tanita Produce Company Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Amended Complaint; Notice of Availability of Magistrate; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery [DE 9] [DE 5] [DE 6] upon Lawrence Ruggiero on 02/29/2020. (DeFalco, Steven)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Lawrence Ruggiero. (HLA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by CF Fresh LLC, Monterey Mushrooms Incorporated, Tanita Produce Company Incorporated. (DeFalco, Steven)
February 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by CF Fresh LLC, Monterey Mushrooms Incorporated, Tanita Produce Company Incorporated [DE 10]. (Attachments: #1 Tracked Changes-Amended Complaint)(DeFalco, Steven)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Amended Complaint filed by Tanita Produce Company Incorporated, Monterey Mushrooms Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lawrence Ruggiero filed by Tanita Produce Company Incorporated, Monterey Mushrooms Incorporated.(DeFalco, Steven)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Monterey Mushrooms Incorporated, Tanita Produce Company Incorporated. Party Bella Fresh Phoenix LLC (an Arizona limited liability company), Daniel Rodriguez (an individual), Bella Fresh Houston LLC (a Texas limited liability company) and Bella Fresh LLC (an Arizona limited liability company) terminated. (DeFalco, Steven)
February 10, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Steven M DeFalco on behalf of Plaintiffs Monterey Mushrooms Incorporated and Tanita Produce Company Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bella Fresh Houston LLC, Bella Fresh LLC, Bella Fresh Phoenix LLC, Daniel Rodriguez, Lawrence Ruggiero. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17931106. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-295-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Tanita Produce Company Incorporated and Monterey Mushrooms Incorporated. (DeFalco, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(DLC)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monterey Mushrooms Incorporated. (DeFalco, Steven) (DLC)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tanita Produce Company Incorporated. (DeFalco, Steven) (DLC)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17931106 filed by Tanita Produce Company Incorporated, Monterey Mushrooms Incorporated.(DeFalco, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanita Produce Company Incorporated et al v. Bella Fresh Phoenix LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanita Produce Company Incorporated
Represented By: Steven M DeFalco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterey Mushrooms Incorporated
Represented By: Steven M DeFalco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CF Fresh LLC
Represented By: Steven M DeFalco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Ruggiero
Represented By: Nicole Maroulakos Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Fresh Phoenix LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Fresh Houston LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Fresh LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?