Tanita Produce Company Incorporated v. Valencia Produce & Food Service Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Tanita Produce Company Incorporated
Defendant: Juan Valencia, Valencia Produce&Food Service Incorporated, Luz Valencia and Valencia Produce & Food Service Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv00304
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #12 , Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
March 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tanita Produce Company Incorporated. (DeFalco, Steven)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tanita Produce Company Incorporated: re: Summons-Complaint; Corp Disclosure Statement; Notice, Consent and Order of Reference; Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery; Order [DE 1], [DE 2], [DE 4], [DE 5], [DE 6], [DE 8] upon Luz Valencia on 02/13/2020. (DeFalco, Steven)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tanita Produce Company Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Summons-Complaint; Corp Disclosure Statement; Notice, Consent and Order of Reference; Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery; Order [DE 1], [DE 2], [DE 4], [DE 5], [DE 6], [DE 8] upon Juan Valencia on 02/13/2020. (DeFalco, Steven)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tanita Produce Company Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Summons-Complaint; Corp Disclosure Statement; Notice, Consent and Order of Reference; Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery; Order [DE 1], [DE 2], [DE 4], [DE 5], [DE 6], [DE 8] upon Valencia Produce & Food Service Incorporated on 02/13/2020. (DeFalco, Steven)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/11/2020. (JAMA)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 12, 2020. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/11/2020. (JAMA)
February 11, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Steven M DeFalco on behalf of Plaintiff Tanita Produce Company Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Juan Valencia, Luz Valencia, Valencia Produce&Food Service Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17936997. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-304-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Tanita Produce Company Incorporated. (DeFalco, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tanita Produce Company Incorporated. (DeFalco, Steven) (KEP)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17936997 filed by Tanita Produce Company Incorporated. (DeFalco, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanita Produce Company Incorporated v. Valencia Produce & Food Service Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valencia Produce&Food Service Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luz Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valencia Produce & Food Service Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanita Produce Company Incorporated
Represented By: Steven M DeFalco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?