Williams-Sullivan v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Tia Williams-Sullivan
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA Disability Plan and JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00315
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Shelley Renee Hebert on behalf of Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA Disability Plan, Prudential Insurance Company of America. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting the parties' #18 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Serve Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project Responses by Thirty (30) Days. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/01/2020. (ESG)
April 1, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Serve MIDP Responses by Tia Williams-Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Scott)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 4/29/2020 at 8:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call by arranging for the presence of all other attorneys and self-represented parties, and by calling chambers at the scheduled time. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/18/2020. (See attached pdf for complete details) (ESG) Modified on 3/18/2020 to correct typo. (ESG).
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA Disability Plan. (Fernandez, Anthony)
March 18, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Fernandez, Anthony)
March 18, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Fernandez, Anthony)
March 18, 2020 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Additional Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA Disability Plan, Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Fernandez, Anthony)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Pursuant to the #11 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint IT IS ORDERED the deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to March 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/04/2020. (ESG)
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA Disability Plan, Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order re Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Fernandez, Anthony)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tia Williams-Sullivan: Return of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits A through E, February 12, 2020 Order (Doc. 5), February 12, 2020 Order (Doc. 6), February 12, 2020 Order (Doc. 7) upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. on 2/13/2020. (Davis, Scott)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tia Williams-Sullivan: Return of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits A through E, February 12, 2020 Order (Doc. 5), February 12, 2020 Order (Doc. 6), February 12, 2020 Order (Doc. 7) upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Disability Plan on 2/13/2020. (Davis, Scott)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tia Williams-Sullivan: Return of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits A through E, February 12, 2020 Order (Doc. 5), February 12, 2020 Order (Doc. 6), February 12, 2020 Order (Doc. 7) upon The Prudential Insurance Company of America on 2/13/2020. (Davis, Scott)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/12/2020. (TCA)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/12/2020. (TCA)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/12/2020. (TCA)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA Disability Plan, Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17941390. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-315-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Tia Williams-Sullivan. (Davis, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17941390 filed by Tia Williams-Sullivan. (Davis, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams-Sullivan v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Fernandez
Represented By: Shelley Renee Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA Disability Plan
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Fernandez
Represented By: Shelley Renee Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Fernandez
Represented By: Shelley Renee Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tia Williams-Sullivan
Represented By: Scott Edward Davis
Represented By: Scott M Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?