BorgWarner Incorporated v. Mariano et al
Plaintiff: BorgWarner Incorporated
Defendant: Eleanor C Mariano, Melissa Gwen Weber, Weber Living Trust, Estate of John H Weber and Mark Daniel Weber
Case Number: 2:2020cv00321
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Eleanor C Mariano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Extend Answer)(Moore, Sean)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 5/20/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call by arranging for the presence of all other attorneys and self-represented parties, and by calling chambers at the scheduled time. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/02/2020. (ESG)
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Errata re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff BorgWarner Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Andrews, Ann-Martha)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint in Interpleader by Estate of John H Weber.(Itri, Robert)
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by BorgWarner Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 3/27/2020 to Melissa G. Weber . (Andrews, Ann-Martha)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by BorgWarner Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 02/26/2020 to Mark Daniel Weber . (Andrews, Ann-Martha)
February 27, 2020 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by BorgWarner Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 02/26/2020 to Weber Living Trust c/o Quinn Williams, attorney for Weber Living Trust. (Andrews, Ann-Martha)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by BorgWarner Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 2/14/2020 to Eleanor C. Mariano c/o Debra J. Polly, attorney for Eleanor C. Mariano. (Andrews, Ann-Martha)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by BorgWarner Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 2/14/2020 to Estate of John H. Weber c/o Michael W. Murphy, attorney for Estate of John H. Weber. (Andrews, Ann-Martha)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 02/12/2020. (ESG)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 02/12/2020. (ESG)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 02/12/2020. (ESG)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BorgWarner Incorporated. (Andrews, Ann-Martha)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff BorgWarner Incorporated. (Andrews, Ann-Martha)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by BorgWarner Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17943392. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-321-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17943392 filed by BorgWarner Incorporated. (Andrews, Ann-Martha) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BorgWarner Incorporated v. Mariano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor C Mariano
Represented By: Sean Mikel Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Gwen Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of John H Weber
Represented By: Michael William Murphy
Represented By: Robert J Itri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Daniel Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BorgWarner Incorporated
Represented By: Ann-Martha Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?