DeClements v. My Home Group Real Estate LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel DeClements
Defendant: My Home Group Real Estate LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00362
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to confer and develop a Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed no later than June 5, 2020 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/10/20. (MAW)
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by My Home Group Real Estate LLC. (Browder, John)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by My Home Group Real Estate LLC.(Browder, John)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' stipulation (Doc. #8 ) and granting Defendant a one-time extension of time until April 10, 2020, to respond to the complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's response to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/12/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by My Home Group Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Browder, John)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daniel DeClements: Declaration of Service re: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL DOCKET; CIVIL COVER SHEET; PRELIMINARY ORDER; NOTICE TO PARTIES; 2 LETTERS DATED 02/20/2020 upon My Home Group Real Estate LLC on 2/28/2020. (Brown, Nathanael) *Modified to correct party served and to remove duplicative text on 3/6/2020 (GMP).
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on May 21, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/19/20. (MAW)
February 19, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Rachel Elizabeth Kaufman on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel DeClements. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to My Home Group Real Estate LLC. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17967629. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-362-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel DeClements. (Brown, Nathanael) (DLC)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17967629 filed by Daniel DeClements. (Brown, Nathanael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeClements v. My Home Group Real Estate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel DeClements
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Kaufman
Represented By: Nathanael Melvin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Home Group Real Estate LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Browder
Represented By: Emily Heath Mann
Represented By: Michael Herman Orcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?