Blum et al v. Banner Health et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Blum and Edward Blum
Defendant: Peter Fine, Banner Boswell Emergency Department, Debbie Flores, Banner Health, Banner Del E Webb Medical Center and Califronia Emergency Physicians
Case Number: 2:2020cv00409
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #15 Defendants Banner, Fine and Flores Certification of the Parties' Good Faith Effort to Meet and Confer by Plaintiffs Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (SST) (3 pages)
April 23, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #13 Defendant California Physicians' (CEP-America Arizona) Certification of the Parties' Good Faith Effort to Meet and Confer by Plaintiffs Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (SST) (3 pages)
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Banner Boswell Emergency Department, Banner Del E Webb Medical Center, Banner Health. (DaPena, Rachel)
April 17, 2020 Filing 15 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Banner Boswell Emergency Department, Banner Del E Webb Medical Center, Banner Health, Peter Fine, Debbie Flores. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record Certificate re Meet and Confer)(DaPena, Rachel)
April 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Banner Boswell Emergency Department, Banner Del E Webb Medical Center, Banner Health, Califronia Emergency Physicians. (MMO)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 *NOTICE re: Certification of the Parties Good Faith Effort to Meet and Confer re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Califronia Emergency Physicians. (Bergen, Curtis) *Modified to correct event on 4/15/2020 (DXD).
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service by Edward Blum. (SST) (1 page)
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Califronia Emergency Physicians. (Bergen, Curtis)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Banner Boswell Emergency Department, Banner Del E Webb Medical Center, Banner Health, Peter Fine, Debbie Flores. (DaPena, Rachel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED: Declaration of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon Peter Fine on 3/11/20. (SST)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED: Declaration of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon Banner Health on 3/11/20. (SST)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED: Proof of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon California Emergency Physicians on 3/11/20. (SST)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED: Declaration of Delivery by Private Process Server re: Summon/Complaint upon Debbie Flores on 3/16/2020. (SST)
February 28, 2020 Summons Issued in paper as to Banner Health, Califronia Emergency Physicians, Peter Fine, Debbie Flores. Summons mailed to pro se plaintiffs on 3/02/2020. (REK)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/25/2020. (MMO)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAS)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX216988. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00409-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX216988 filed by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum.(BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blum et al v. Banner Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Fine
Represented By: Sigurds Michael Krolls
Represented By: Rachel Anna DaPena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Boswell Emergency Department
Represented By: Sigurds Michael Krolls
Represented By: Rachel Anna DaPena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Flores
Represented By: Sigurds Michael Krolls
Represented By: Rachel Anna DaPena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Health
Represented By: Sigurds Michael Krolls
Represented By: Rachel Anna DaPena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Del E Webb Medical Center
Represented By: Sigurds Michael Krolls
Represented By: Rachel Anna DaPena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Califronia Emergency Physicians
Represented By: Neil C Alden
Represented By: Curtis Marshall Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?